JONES, SR. v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY JONES, SR.
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06642
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-05746. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 170) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gregory Jones, Sr... (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 10/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference previously scheduled for 10/26/2021 is continued to 1/25/2022 at 1:30 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory Jones, Sr.. Service waived by All Defendants. (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Plaintiff's Counsel was also notified via email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16220597.). Filed byGregory Jones, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 7/27/2021)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]
July 27, 2021 #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED, PLEASE USE ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NECESSARY. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-fil e in its entirety. Re: #1 Summons filed by Gregory Jones, Sr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES, SR. v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY JONES, SR.
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?