ABDO v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: ELSHADAY ABDO
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06649
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ELSHADAY ABDO. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELSHADAY ABDO.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 Remark - Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 1:21-cv-635 on 10/26/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6648-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Texas, Cause No. 4:21-cv-3158 on 11/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6649-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Washington, Cause No. 3:21-cv-5695 on 10/26/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6650-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of West Virginia, Cause No. 3:21-cv-526 on 10/26/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6651-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB(LBT)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/2/2021.(LBT)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-03158. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 1, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana to be included in MDL Docket No. 2570. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Elshaday Abdo, filed.(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(RachelWillborgadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(BrandisIsom, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Elshaday Abdo, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27115597) filed by Elshaday Abdo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABDO v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELSHADAY ABDO
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?