GOMBERG v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN GOMBERG and BRIAN M. GOMBERG
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06659
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 2:21-cv-755 on 11/4/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6659-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Florida, Cause No. 5:21-cv-201 on 11/3/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6660-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB (LBT)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/4/2021.(LBT)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:21-cv-00755. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO - 172) transferring case to: Southern District of Indiana, MDL case number: 2570. (LMF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 10/18/2021 by Brian Gomberg as to Cook Medical, LLC. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 10/18/2021 by Brian Gomberg as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 10/18/2021 by Brian Gomberg as to Cook Incorporated. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 10/18/2021 by Brian Gomberg as to Cook Group Incorporated. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Cook Medical, LLC. (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Cook Group Incorporated. (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Cook Incorporated. (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/13/2021. (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0755-JLB-MRM. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18806664) filed by Brian Gomberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOMBERG v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN GOMBERG
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN M. GOMBERG
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?