DOUGHERTY v. ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC
Plaintiff: MARC DOUGHERTY
Defendant: ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC and ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental
Case Number: 1:2022cv00153
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2022. Discovery due by 11/1/2022. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/10/2022. (GD)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/9/2022. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Plaintiff shall file response to notice of removal required by Local Rule 81-1(b) by 3/18/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/26/2022 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bettina J. Strauss for ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/10/2022. (SWM)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney James Emanuel, Jr for ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/10/2022. (SWM)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/9/2022.(SWM)
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bettina J. Strauss to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7004970), filed by Defendant ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bettina J. Strauss)(Strauss, Bettina) Modified on 3/10/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
March 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) James P. Emanuel, Jr. to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number CINSDC-7004600), filed by Defendant ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James P. Emanuel, Jr.)(Emanuel, James) Modified on 3/10/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental . (Hall, Angela)
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental.(Hall, Angela)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before March 3, 2022. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/1/2022.(SWM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental (Hall, Angela) Modified on 1/27/2022 (AKH).
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #2 Notice of Removal by ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, Complaint, Appearance, Summonses, Return Receipts, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Angela)
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental. (Hall, Angela)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Williams on behalf of Defendant ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental. (Williams, Liam)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental. (RAGS) (NLR)
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bartholomew County Superior Court, case number 03D01-2112-CT-6409, filed by ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6935517) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Record), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Angela)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Kelver Hall on behalf of Defendant ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC. (Hall, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOUGHERTY v. ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC DOUGHERTY
Represented By: Bryce A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC dba National Car Rental
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: Bettina J. Strauss
Represented By: James Emanuel, Jr
Represented By: Liam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?