MUDD v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. MUDD
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 1:2022cv00202
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0423 Social Security Act (Disability Insurance Benefit Payments)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 ENTRY on Briefing Schedule. See Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/21/2022.(SWM)
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative records part 1, #3 administrative records part 2, #4 payment documents, #5 jurisdictional documents, #6 non disability related records, #7 disability related records, #8 medical records, #9 administrative related records, #10 payment documents, #11 jurisdictional documents part 1, #12 jurisdictional documents part 2, #13 non disability related records, #14 disability related records, #15 medical records part 1, #16 medical records part 2, #17 medical records part 3, #18 medical records part 4, #19 medical records part 5, #20 medical records part 6, #21 medical records part 7, #22 medical records part 8, #23 medical records part 9, #24 medical records part 10, #25 medical records part 11, #26 medical records part 12, #27 medical records part 13, #28 medical records part 14, #29 medical records part 15, #30 medical records part 16, #31 medical records part 17, #32 medical records part 18, #33 medical records part 19, #34 medical records part 20, #35 medical records part 21, #36 medical records part 22, #37 medical records part 23, #38 medical records part 24, #39 medical records part 25, #40 medical records part 26, #41 medical records part 27, #42 medical records part 28, #43 medical records part 29, #44 medical records part 30, #45 medical records part 31, #46 medical records part 32, #47 medical records part 33, #48 medical records part 34, #49 medical records part 35, #50 medical records part 36, #51 medical records part 37)(Wierenga, Julian)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge - Based on the written consents of the parties, this action is now referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. PLEASE USE ALTERED CASE NO. 1:22-cv-00202-MJD-TWP ON ALL FUTURE FILINGS WITH THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/7/2022. (AKH)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy E. Burns on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLES A. MUDD. (Burns, Timothy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Thomas Lavella on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLES A. MUDD. (Lavella, Nicholas)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Frederick Richter on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLES A. MUDD. (Richter, Matthew)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by CHARLES A. MUDD. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6945419) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUDD v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. MUDD
Represented By: Nicholas Thomas Lavella
Represented By: Timothy E. Burns
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?