TURNER v. HAMILTON COUNTY TRUSTEE ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: KEITH TURNER
Defendant: HAMILTON COUNTY TRUSTEE ASSOCIATION and WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP
Case Number: 1:2022cv00275
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to , filed by Defendants HAMILTON COUNTY TRUSTEE ASSOCIATION, WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP. (Bradley, Jacob)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Proceed on Merits, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Correspondence and Service, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Emergency Injunction, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Rescind Previous Motion, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Serve Summons, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP. WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP waiver sent on 2/24/2022. (Dollens, Lucy)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob V. Bradley on behalf of Defendant WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP. (Bradley, Jacob)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy Renee Dollens on behalf of Defendant WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP. (Dollens, Lucy)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Rescind Request, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Motion to Rescind)(AKH)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Seal Court Documents, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Relief from Ongoing Damages, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Main Document)(AKH)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Time Limit of Remittance, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Main Document)(AKH)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENTRY ON THIRD MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - On March 4, 2022, pro se plaintiff Keith Turner filed a Third Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. #12 ), again asking for monetary damages. For the reasons explained in the Court's previous Orders (Filing No. #6 ; Filing No. #9 ), the Third Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. #12 ) is DENIED. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/10/2022. (AKH)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Recalculate Amount of Relief, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (AKH)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon: Hamilton County Trustee Association. (AKH)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISCUSSING ACTION, AND DIRECTING SERVICE - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #8 ) and Refiled Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. #7 ), and for screening. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Refiled Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. #7 ) is DENIED AS PREMATURE. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) requires the Court to order service for Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Clerk is designated pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) to issue process to Defendant Hamilton County Trustee Association in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the Complaint (Filing No. #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/24/2022. (AKH)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff KEITH TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING #3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Pro se Plaintiff Keith Turner's Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Dkt. #2 , is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Mr. Turner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs form for a non-inmate to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as the accompanying instruction packet. Mr. Turner is given until Tuesday, March 1, 2022 to properly answer the questions on the form under penalty of perjury. The Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Dkt. #3 , is also DENIED as premature. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Blank Form: Request to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying the Filing Fee) (AKH)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Inability of Plaintiff to Locate Defendant's Attorney Contact by KEITH TURNER. (DJH)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff, KEITH TURNER. (DJH)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, KEITH TURNER. (DJH)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAMILTON COUNTY TRUSTEE ASSOCIATION, filed by KEITH TURNER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. HAMILTON COUNTY TRUSTEE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON COUNTY TRUSTEE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTFIELD WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP
Represented By: Jacob V. Bradley
Represented By: Lucy Renee Dollens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?