PARKER v. FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD E. PARKER
Defendant: FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA, CLARK DIETZ, INC. and INDOT
Case Number: 1:2022cv00291
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant INDOT. (Golten, Lydia)
March 7, 2022 Filing 29 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant CLARK DIETZ, INC.. (Patterson, Chase)
March 7, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant CLARK DIETZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Chase)
March 2, 2022 Filing 27 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA. (Sickmann, Andrew)
March 2, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sickmann, Andrew)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant Indiana Department of Transportation's #23 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 3/9/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/2/2022. (SWM)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference - Being duly advised, the court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. #22 ) filed by the "Indiana Defendants" (all except the Federal Highway Administration) to continue the Initial Pretrial Conference set for March 8, 2022. In addition, the parties are not required to prepare a proposed case management plan at this time. The Initial Pretrial Conference set for March 8, 2022, is VACATED and will be reset as appropriate. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/2/2022.(SWM)
March 1, 2022 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to March 9, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant INDOT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golten, Lydia)
March 1, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Continuance on Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Defendants CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA, CLARK DIETZ, INC., INDOT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golten, Lydia)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant City of Richmond, Indiana's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 3/2/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/23/2022. (SWM)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Indiana Department of Transportation's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 3/2/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/23/2022. (SWM)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant Clark Dietz, Inc's #8 Motion for Extension of Time - IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that Defendant Clark Dietz, Inc. is hereby granted an extension of time to, and including, March 6, 2022, within which to respond by motion or pleading to the Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/22/2021. (SWM)
February 17, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 2, 2022 in which to #5 Exhibit Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sickmann, Andrew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Sickmann on behalf of Defendant CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA. (Sickmann, Andrew)
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service, filed by Defendant INDOT (Golten, Lydia)
February 16, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Austin Rowlett on behalf of Defendant INDOT. (Rowlett, Robert)
February 16, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 2, 2022 , to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant INDOT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golten, Lydia)
February 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Ann Golten on behalf of Defendant INDOT. (Golten, Lydia)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COURT, filed by Defendant FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION (Fischer, Rachana)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Christo Nizamoff on behalf of Defendant CLARK DIETZ, INC.. (Nizamoff, Nicholas)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLARK DIETZ, INC.. (Patterson, Chase)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 6, 2022 , filed by Defendant CLARK DIETZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Patterson, Chase)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chase Michael Patterson on behalf of Defendant CLARK DIETZ, INC.. (Patterson, Chase)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PENDING STATE COURT MOTIONS, filed by Defendant FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION (Fischer, Rachana)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal [Attachment: State Court Record docket sheet, appearance, summons (24), complaint, order, appearance, motion for enlargement of time (2), order, motion for enlargement of time, appearance (2), motion to dismiss, appearance, notice of removal, order (2)] by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION. (Fischer, Rachana)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DWH)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2022 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/10/2022.(SWM)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachana Nagin Fischer on behalf of Defendant FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION. (Fischer, Rachana)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wayne Superior Court, case number 89D01-2201-CT-000001, filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fischer, Rachana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKER v. FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD E. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Rachana Nagin Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF RICHMOND, INDIANA
Represented By: Andrew J. Sickmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK DIETZ, INC.
Represented By: Chase Michael Patterson
Represented By: Nicholas Christo Nizamoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDOT
Represented By: Lydia Ann Golten
Represented By: Robert Austin Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?