NIM-FMC, LLC v. RCG INDIANA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NIM-FMC, LLC
Defendant: RCG INDIANA, LLC and FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00484
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #20 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Amended Complaint and Jury Demand , filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Johnson, James)
May 9, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #20 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, James)
May 9, 2022 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA, RCG INDIANA, LLC, filed by NIM-FMC, LLC.(Johnson, James)
May 9, 2022 Filing 20 SEALED Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Johnson, James)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL - Plaintiff's Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal,[Dkt. #18 ], is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Additionally, as the initial complaint has been rendered moot by the filing of the amended complaint, Plaintiff's initial motion to seal, [Dkt. #4 ], is DENIED AS MOOT and the Clerk is directed to permanently seal Docket No. 3. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall (1) file a Brief in Support in compliance with Local Rule 5-11; and (2) file a new, appropriately redacted public version of the documents it seeks to maintain under seal. Failure to comply with this order and the Local Rules and/or the continued over-redaction of the material submitted to the Court may result in the denial of the motion to seal. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/25/2022. (SWM)
April 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #16 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, James)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA, RCG INDIANA, LLC, filed by NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement)(Johnson, James)
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 SEALED Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement)(Johnson, James)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by NIM-FMC, LLC. RCG INDIANA, LLC waiver sent on 3/14/2022. (Johnson, James)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by NIM-FMC, LLC. FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA waiver sent on 3/14/2022. (Johnson, James)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Directing Further Proceedings - Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to file an amended complaint remedying these defects and establishing that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction by April 22, 2022. The failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Plaintiff should also file a new Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal to accompany the amended complaint. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 4/4/2022.(JDC)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mark Silberman for NIM-FMC, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/24/2022. (SWM)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew J. Langley for NIM-FMC, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/24/2022. (SWM)
March 22, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark J. Silberman to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7023088), filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, James)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew J. Langley to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7023070), filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, James)
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA, RCG INDIANA, LLC. (JDC)
March 15, 2022 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JDC)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J. Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Sullivan, Chad)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NIM-FMC, LLC. (Johnson, James)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #1 Complaint, #3 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, James)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 *** PERMANENTLY SEALED PER DKT. NUMBER #19 *** SEALED Complaint and Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, James) Modified on 4/26/2022 (SWM).
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff NIM-FMC, LLC. (Johnson, James)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA, RCG INDIANA, LLC, filed by NIM-FMC, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7011537) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Under Seal, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIM-FMC, LLC v. RCG INDIANA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIM-FMC, LLC
Represented By: Chad J. Sullivan
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Mark Silberman
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCG INDIANA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?