STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Not Classified By Court: KEN ELDER
Case Number: 1:2022cv00696
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (England, Annette)
May 27, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Illinois Action - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cleveland.com MoneyMatters Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reuters Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dallas Business Journal Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - Unclaimed Property Professionals Organization Article, #6 Exhibit 6- Journal of Passthrough Entities - State Law & State Taxation Corner Article, #7 Appendix of Exhibits, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
May 27, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Relator KEN ELDER, Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Golub, David)
May 27, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Relator KEN ELDER, Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K)(Golub, David)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Neaha P Raol for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/19/2022. (SWM)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Douglas W. Baruch for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/19/2022. (SWM)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jennifer M. Wollenberg for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/19/2022. (SWM)
May 18, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (England, Annette)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MoneyGram Case Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - MoneyGram Case Response, #3 Exhibit 3 - MoneyGram Case Reply, #4 Exhibit 4 - MoneyGram Case First Interim Report of the Special Master, #5 Exhibit 5 - CA Action First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - CA Action Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - CA Action Motion to Remand, #8 Exhibit 8 - CA Action Relator's Motion for Summary Adjudication, #9 Exhibit 9 - IL Action Second Amended Qui Tam Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - IL Action Transcript of Motion Hearing, #11 Exhibit 11 - IL Action Third Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12- IL Action Relator's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #13 Exhibit 13 - NJ Action Third Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit 14 - Dill Action Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(England, Annette)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neaha P. Raol to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7109414), filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raol, Neaha)
May 18, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas W. Baruch to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7109082), filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baruch, Douglas)
May 18, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer M. Wollenberg to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7108877), filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wollenberg, Jennifer)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. [Dkt. #15 ]. The motion requests the Court to set briefing schedules with regard to Relator's Motion for Remand [Dkt. #12 ], and Defendant JPM's motion to dismiss to be filed. Id. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the motion. Defendant JPM shall file any opposition to Relator's Motion for Remand on or before May 18, 2022, and Relator shall file any reply in support of its Motion for Remand on or before May 27, 2022. In addition, the time for Defendant to file any response to Relator's Complaint is hereby enlarged to and including May 27, 2022; if Defendant's response is a motion to dismiss, Relator shall file any response to the motion to dismiss on or before June 21, 2022, and Defendant shall file any reply in support of its motion to dismiss on or before July 1, 2022. No further enlargement of these deadlines is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/4/2022. (SWM)
May 2, 2022 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 13, 2022 in which to #12 MOTION to Remand , #2 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Relator KEN ELDER. (Golub, David)
April 27, 2022 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Relator KEN ELDER. (Golub, David)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Relator KEN ELDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Golub, David)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra L. Blevins on behalf of Relator KEN ELDER, Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Blevins, Sandra)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Devorkin on behalf of Relator KEN ELDER. (Devorkin, Michael)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L. Matsoukas on behalf of Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Matsoukas, Kathleen)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Golub on behalf of Relator KEN ELDER. (Golub, David)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendant, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("Defendant") has filed an Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff-Relator Ken Elder's ("Relator") Fourth Amended Qui Tam Complaint ("Complaint"). [Dkt. #6 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the motion. Defendant shall file a response to Relator's Complaint on or before May 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/13/2022. (SWM)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 Submission of State Court Record received from Marion County Superior Court Cause No. 49DO7- 1909-PL-037448. (MAC)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (England, Annette)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D07-1909-PL-037448, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7048489) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(England, Annette)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette M. England on behalf of Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (England, Annette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. KEN ELDER
Represented By: Erica Sue Sullivan
Represented By: Sandra L. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Annette M. England
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wollenberg
Represented By: Kathleen L. Matsoukas
Represented By: Neaha P Raol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KEN ELDER
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Michael Devorkin
Represented By: Sandra L. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?