TOLER v. GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS d/b/a GREEN ARROW LOANS, et al.
Plaintiff: John Toler
Defendant: Green Arrow Solutions d/b/a Green Arrow Loans, Integra Financial Services, LLC, Nevada Impact Management, LLC, Dan K Shaw, Gregory Jones and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv01214
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 59 FINAL JUDGMENT - PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 58; The Court having this day directed the entry of final judgment, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. Mr. Toler's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice and the putative class claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr on 11/17/2022. (CKM)
January 17, 2023 Filing 58 CLOSED DISMISSED - Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal, [Doc. No. 57], and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the court DISMISSES Mr. Toler's individual claims with prejudice and the putative class claims without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr on 1/17/2023. (CKM)
January 16, 2023 Filing 57 STIPULATION of Dismissal , as to Defendants GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS, INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, GREGORY JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K SHAW, filed by JOHN TOLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal)(Goldstein, Matthew)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers to 2/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/11/2023. (SWM)
January 9, 2023 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/7/2023 (Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers), filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers)(Goldstein, Matthew)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a resolution has been reached in this action. (Dkt. #53 .) Therefore, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT & all previously ordered dates are VACATED. Within 60 days, the parties shall file for a dismissal. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/10/2022. (GD)
November 10, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Settlement , as to Defendants GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS, INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREGORY JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K SHAW, filed by JOHN TOLER (Goldstein, Matthew)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, hereby RESCHEDULES the November 16, 2022 telephonic status conference to Monday, November 14, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. (Eastern), to be held in conjunction with the telephonic discovery conference at that same date and time. All other requirements of the Court's Order scheduling the telephonic status conference [Dkt. #38 at 2] remain in effect. On or before 10:00 a.m. (Eastern) on November 10, 2022, the parties are to email the Court at MJDinsmore@insd.uscourts.gov, with a copy to each other, a brief outline of the discovery disputes, their respective positions on the issue(s), the discovery requests and responses at issue (if any), and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the conference. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/8/2022.(SWM)
November 4, 2022 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue (Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue), filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F)(Edelman, Daniel)
November 3, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Briefing or Extend Deadlines to Respond to the Integra Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Until After the Completion of Jurisdictional Discovery, filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Matthew)
October 26, 2022 Filing 48 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREGORY JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K SHAW. (Lally, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendants INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREGORY JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lally, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Until After the Completion of Discovery Concerning Facts Raised Therein [Dkt. #41 ]; the motion is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's request to stay briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; however, the Court will enlarge the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 39], which response shall be filed on or before December 2, 2022. Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' motion to stay [Dkt. #44 ] is DENIED. The parties shall comply with the discovery schedule set forth in Docket No. 38 and the Court will promptly endeavor to resolve any discovery disputes that may arise. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/26/2022. (SWM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 45 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions Motion to Stay Briefing, filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/25/2022 to update document title and remove incorrect linking (BRR).
October 24, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION to Stay Discovery Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/25/2022 to update document title and remove incorrect linking(BRR).
October 24, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-1214-RLM-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign case to Judge Robert L. Miller Jr.. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/21/2022.(AKH)
October 19, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Until After the Completion of Discovery Concerning Facts Raised Therein, filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Edelman, Daniel) Modified on 10/20/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
October 14, 2022 Filing 40 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit EX A-Big Valley Constitution, #3 Exhibit EX B-Resolution, #4 Exhibit EX C-Resolution and Ordinance, #5 Exhibit EX D-Resolution)(Bazzazieh, Saba)
October 14, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/17/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/7/2022. Counsel for Defendants Nevada Impact Management, LLC, Dan Shaw, and Gregory Jones moved without opposition to enlarge time for those Defendants to respond to Complaint; that motion is GRANTED; Defendants Nevada Impact Management, LLC, Dan Shaw, and Gregory Jones shall respond to Complaint on or before 10/26/2022. Within 7 days of filing of motion to dismiss by Defendant Green Arrow Solutions, Plaintiff shall serve any discovery necessary for him to respond to that motion. Defendant Green Arrow Solutions shall serve any objections to such discovery within 14 days of its service, and shall fully respond to such discovery (to include production of any responsive documents), subject to any objections asserted, within 21 days of its service. Court further orders as set forth. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/16/2022 at 2:30 PM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES & ADDITIONAL INFORMATION.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 11/04/2022 re #22 Motion to Transfer Case Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/11/2022. (SWM)
October 7, 2022 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 11/04/2022 re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue , filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Matthew) Modified on 10/11/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER STRIKING MOTIONS TO DISMISS - The Clerk is directed to show that Docket Nos. 24 through 31 are STRICKEN from the docket. On or before October 14, 2022, Defendant Green Arrow Solutions shall refile one motion to dismiss, with one supporting brief, containing all of the bases that Defendant Green Arrow Solutions seeks to assert for the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/6/2022. (JRB)
October 6, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Defendants INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREGORY JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K SHAW. (Lally, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/5/2022. (GD)
September 30, 2022 Filing 31 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(7) , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 30 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** MOTION to Dismiss Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(7), filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/3/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 29 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 28 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/3/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 27 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 26 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/3/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 25 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) , filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit EX A-Big Valley Constitution, #3 Exhibit EX B-Resolution, #4 Exhibit EX C-Resolution and Ordinance, #5 Exhibit EX D-Resolution)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 24 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. STRICKEN BY #35 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/3/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). Modified on 10/6/2022 (JRB).
September 30, 2022 Filing 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue Brief in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Bazzazieh, Saba)
September 30, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case Specially-Appearing Defendant Green Arrow Solutions' Motion to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 10/3/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
September 30, 2022 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER . (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Reset Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/7/2022 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. All other requirements of the Court's Orders scheduling the conference [Dkts. 13 & 17] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/28/2022.(SWM)
September 28, 2022 Filing 19 Submission of Proposed Order , re #18 Unopposed MOTION To Reset Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 27, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION To Reset Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff JOHN TOLER. (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion that on or before September 30, 2022, Defendant Green Arrow shall file a response to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, and the parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan, Section III(A) through (E) of which shall include the deadlines included in the Court's Scheduling Order. [Dkt. 13 at 1-2.] In addition, the Court, sua sponte, hereby CONTINUES the September 27, 2022 telephonic initial pretrial conference to TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 10/4/2022 at 4:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/21/2022.(CBU)
September 20, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 9/21/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH).
September 2, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JOHN TOLER. DAN K SHAW waiver sent on 7/27/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 2, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JOHN TOLER. GREGORY JONES waiver sent on 7/27/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2022 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before September 23, 2022. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/30/2022.(SWM)
August 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS (Bazzazieh, Saba) Modified on 8/17/2022 - edited title (AKH).
August 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Saba Bazzazieh on behalf of Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (Bazzazieh, Saba)
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie St. Germain on behalf of Defendant GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS. (St. Germain, Nicole)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN TOLER. GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS served on 8/2/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN TOLER. INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC served on 6/23/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN TOLER. NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 6/22/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 16, 2022 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (BRR)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS D/B/A GREEN ARROW LOANS, INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, GREGORY JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K SHAW. (BRR)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Plaintiff John Toler. (Kolbus, Heather)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Goldstein on behalf of Plaintiff John Toler. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff John Toler. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7149145) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOLER v. GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS d/b/a GREEN ARROW LOANS, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Toler
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Arrow Solutions d/b/a Green Arrow Loans
Represented By: Nicole Marie St. Germain
Represented By: Saba Bazzazieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integra Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Impact Management, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan K Shaw
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Jones
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?