ENIGWE v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, et al
Plaintiff: IFEDOO ENIGWE
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AUTHOR SOLUTIONS, LLC OF DELAWARE, AMAZON.COM INC and AUTHORHOUSE
Case Number: 1:2022cv01388
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON AUGUST 17, 2022, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Plaintiff appeared in person and Defendants by counsel August 17, 2022, for a telephonic status conference. Copy Mailed. **SEE ORDER** Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG).
August 11, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against IFEDOO ENIGWE, filed by AUTHOR SOLUTIONS, LLC OF DELAWARE, AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC.(Zimmerly, Philip)
August 8, 2022 Filing 45 Statement of Ds' Position After Transfer of Venue from US Disctrict Court for the District of Delaware by All Defendants. (Zimmerly, Philip)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Brandon Ryan Harper and Nicholas D. Mozal withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/20/2022 Copies sent via US Mail (CBU)
July 19, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance - Nicholas D. Mozal and Brandon R. Harper, filed by Defendants AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AUTHOR SOLUTIONS, LLC OF DELAWARE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Appearances of Mozal and Harper)(Zimmerly, Philip)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference and Further Proceedings: Status Conference set for 8/17/2022 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Plaintiff shall personally participate in this conference by calling chambers directly at 317-229-3660. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The purpose of this conference is to address case status and settlement. By August 12, 2022, counsel shall confer and file a joint list of all motions that remained pending prior to transfer that require a ruling from this court. See Order for additional information. Copy to Plaintiff, Brandon Ryan Harper and Nicholas D. Mozal via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/19/2022.(SWM)
July 18, 2022 Filing 41 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
July 18, 2022 Filing 40 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) Modified on 7/18/2022 (DWH).
July 18, 2022 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:21-cv-00453. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORAL ORDER: The motion to extend time to respond until August 11 D.I. #37 is granted. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 7/7/2022. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Unopposed) - filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mozal, Nicholas) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part #28 Motion to Dismiss, Ifedoo Enigwe's antitrust claim and his copyright-infringement claim based on the rejected theory that AuthorHouse lost all rights to sell his book in 2007 is DISMISSED ; #31 Motion for Entry of Default is DENIED. Ifedoo Enigwe's other copyright-infringement claim is TRANFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 06/28/2022. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 06/28/2022. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #31 REQUEST for Default as to Ifedoo Enigwe - filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (srs) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 REQUEST for Default as to Ifedoo Enigwe filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Harper, Brandon) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 25, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harper, Brandon) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 31 REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Ifedoo Enigwe - filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)(srs) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (srs) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 29 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2022. (Harper, Brandon) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, to Transfer - filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harper, Brandon) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Unopposed). Defendants' answer or other response to the plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is due on March 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 2/18/2022. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Unopposed) - filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harper, Brandon) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Ryan Harper on behalf of Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware (Harper, Brandon) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
February 8, 2022 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware- filed by Ifedoo Enigwe.(smg) (Main Document 24 replaced on 2/9/2022) (smg). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting D.I. #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 2/3/2022. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 2/3/2022. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge Michael A. Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 12/14/2021. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (SB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Alan R. Silverstein as counsel for Defendants, and Certificate of Service by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware re #3 Amended Complaint, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer (Mozal, Nicholas) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 Duplicate SUR-REPLY BRIEF to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer - filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 SUR-REPLY BRIEF to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer - filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Remark: Plaintiff originally mailed his Sur-Reply on 06/17/2021. As of today, the Court hasn't received that mail. Plaintiff decided to drop off a hard copy today to be docketed, see D.I. #18 . (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Silverstein, Alan) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 REDACTED VERSION of 14 Affidavit, by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Silverstein, Alan) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer - filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (cna, ) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/2/2021) (cna, ). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
June 2, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: Document at DI# 15 replaced due to missing page. (cna, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 [SEALED] AFFIDAVIT of Bryan H. Babb re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 6/1/2021 (dlw). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/11/2021. (Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 6/1/2021 (dlw). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer - filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 6/1/2021 (dlw).[Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 30, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Craig E. Pinkus and Philip Zimmerly for Amazon.Com Services, LLC and Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig E. Pinkus and Philip Zimmerly - filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Silverstein, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2021: #1 Certificate of Service) (dlw). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig E. Pinkus and Philip Zimmerly filed by Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware, Amazon.Com Services, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/28/2021. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 4/28/2021*** (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Amazon.Com Services, LLC answer due 5/28/2021; Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware answer due 5/28/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/28/2021. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 4/28/2021*** (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 28, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service previously filed at D.I. 12 has been added to D.I. 11 and deleted from the docket. In the future, counsel shall attach the certificate of service to the corresponding document and not file as a separate docket entry. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent GoDirect, LLC for Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware filed by Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Mozal, Nicholas) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.Com Services, LLC filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC. (Silverstein, Alan) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint - filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 4/28/2021 (dlw). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ifedoo Enigwe. Amazon.Com Services, LLC served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ifedoo Enigwe. Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for Magistrate Consent. Acknowledgment filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for Rule 4 (Summons). Acknowledgment filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com Services, LLC, and Author Solutions, LLC of Delaware- filed by Ifedoo Enigwe.(mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
April 6, 2021 Remark: Acknowledgement for Rule 4, and Acknowledgment for Mag Consent re-mailed to Plaintiff at their request. (sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 31, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Amazon.com, Inc., Author Solutions Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number DEX035398.) - filed by Ifedoo Enigwe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Remark: Acknowledgement for Rule 4, Acknowledgment for Mag Consent, and Privacy Notice mailed to Plaintiff. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon.com, Inc. on 3/25/2021; Author Solutions Inc. on 3/25/2021. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/18/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENIGWE v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTHOR SOLUTIONS, LLC OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTHORHOUSE
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IFEDOO ENIGWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?