SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC v. ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC. et al
Plaintiff: SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC
Defendant: ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC. and DANNY CHAN
Case Number: 1:2022cv01852
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC., DANNY CHAN. (Tipton, David)
November 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC., DANNY CHAN. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Tipton, David)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2022 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/14/2022.(JRB)
October 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Charles Lee Mudd, Jr hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Mudd, Charles)
October 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Lee Mudd, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC. (Mudd, Charles)
October 5, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC., DANNY CHAN. (Tipton, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC.. ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC. waiver sent on 9/21/2022. (Tipton, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DANNY CHAN. DANNY CHAN waiver sent on 9/21/2022. (Tipton, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Tipton on behalf of Defendants ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC., DANNY CHAN. (Tipton, David)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement of Spectrevision Industries LLC, re #4 Order by SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC. (Mudd, Charles)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC. (Mudd, Charles)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC. (RAGS) (DWH)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED WITHOUT PDF ATTACHMENT - SEE DKT 7 FOR ATTACHMENT*** NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC. (RAGS) (DWH) Modified on 9/22/2022 (DWH).
September 22, 2022 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - Therefore, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a jurisdictional statement by October 20, 2022, addressing the issue identified in this order (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/21/2022. (DWH)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC. (DJH)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number BINSDC-7287729) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Corporate Guarantee, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Mudd, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC v. ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPECTREVISION INDUSTRIES LLC
Represented By: Charles Lee Mudd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALMOST NEVER FILMS INC.
Represented By: David J. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANNY CHAN
Represented By: David J. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?