SILBAUGH et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Plaintiff: ERIC SILBAUGH and MELINDA LONG
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2022cv02189
Filed: November 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - WHEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this matter is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, costs paid. Signed by District Judge Richard L Young on 04/04/2023.(AAS)
April 3, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice, as to Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, Plaintiffs MELINDA LONG, ERIC SILBAUGH, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schiferl, Kevin)
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
March 10, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Ira, Adam)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/3/2023 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The conference will be ex parte and neither Defendant's representative or counsel should attend. Plaintiffs shall appear by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. Plaintiffs, Eric Silbaugh and Melinda Long shall personally participate in this conference by calling Chambers at 317.229.3660. The purpose of this conference is to address Plaintiffs' counsel, Jason A. Shartzer and Shannon B. Mize's motion to withdraw as counsel of record. [Filing No. 15.] Jason A. Shartzer and Shannon B. Mize are required to serve Plaintiffs Eric Silbaugh and. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/8/2023.(SWM)
March 7, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiffs MELINDA LONG, ERIC SILBAUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mize, Shannon)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Kevin C. Schiferl hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Schiferl, Kevin)
February 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Adam Spencer Ira hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Ira, Adam)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by Counsel on 1/18/2022, for a Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2024. Discovery due by 9/11/2023. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/31/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/19/2023.(SWM)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Court, on its own motion, reassigns the January 18, 2023, initial pretrial conference to be held by TELEPHONE. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this conference will be provided by separate notification. All other requirements and deadlines set forth in the Court o order of November 22, 2022, remain in effect. [Filing No. 7.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/5/2023.(SWM)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY . (Schiferl, Kevin)
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for an initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on January 18, 2023, at 2 p.m. in Room 234, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. All persons entering the United States Courthouse must have photo identification. ***SEE ORDER*** Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/22/2022.(JDC)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Spencer Ira on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Ira, Adam)
November 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D01-2210-CT-036278, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7367216) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiferl, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILBAUGH et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC SILBAUGH
Represented By: Jason A. Shartzer
Represented By: Shannon Bogard Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA LONG
Represented By: Jason A. Shartzer
Represented By: Shannon Bogard Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Adam Spencer Ira
Represented By: Kevin C. Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?