LYNCH v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: JUNE G. LYNCH
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2022cv06913
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 **PLEASE DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DKT. 23204** NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) Modified on 12/22/2022 (LBT).
December 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff JUNE LYNCH. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JUNE LYNCH.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 Remark - Case Transferred In from Central District of California, Cause No. 2:22-cv-6588 on 11/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6911-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 1:22-cv-2521 on 10/24/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6912-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Massachusetts, Cause No. 3:22-cv-30127 on 10/26/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6913-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Easter District of Michigan, Cause No. 2:22-cv-12277 on 10/25/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6914-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Texas, Cause No. 4:22-cv-750 on 10/24/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6915-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Texas, Cause No. 4:22-cv-825 on 10/24/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6916-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Virginia, Cause No. 1:22-cv-35 on 10/24/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6917-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB(LBT)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/7/2022.(LBT)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 3:22-cv-30127. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred to the District of Indiana Southern pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 10/24/2022. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/26/2022.]
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 224 in MDL Case 2570 received from Southern District of Indiana requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/26/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by June G Lynch. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by June G Lynch. (Dalimonte, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/26/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Figueroa, Tamara) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/26/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/26/2022.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9513084 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by June G Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Form)(Dalimonte, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/26/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNCH v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE G. LYNCH
Represented By: John A. Dalimonte
Represented By: Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?