WEST v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: NANCI WEST
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2022cv06929
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02368-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02378-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02401-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02407-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02445-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02455-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02463-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02479-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02490-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06910-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06924-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06925-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06927-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06929-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06930-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06932-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06936-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06937-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06938-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06939-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06940-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06941-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06944-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06947-RLY-TAB, 1:23-cv-06953-RLY-TAB, 1:23-cv-06955-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
January 17, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02368-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02378-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02401-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02407-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02445-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02455-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02463-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02479-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02490-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06910-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06924-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06925-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06927-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06929-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06930-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06932-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06936-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06937-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06938-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06939-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06940-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06941-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06944-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06947-RLY-TAB, 1:23-cv-06953-RLY-TAB, 1:23-cv-06955-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff NANCI WEST. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06929-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer)
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 Submission SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, filed by NANCI WEST. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06929-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 Remark - Case Transferred In from Southern District of Alabama, Cause No. 1:22-cv-417 on 12/2/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6924-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Arizona, Cause No. 2:22-cv-1841 on 11/29/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6925-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Colorado, Cause No. 1:22-cv-2849 on 12/01/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6926-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Connecticut, Cause No. 3:22-cv-1348 on 11/29/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6927-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Georgia, Cause No. 1:22-cv-174 on 11/29/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6928-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Georgia, Cause No. 1:22-cv-4379 on 11/30/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6929-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Iowa, Cause No. 1:22-cv-18 on 11/30/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6930-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06924-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06925-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06927-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06929-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06930-RLY-TAB (LBT) Modified on 12/2/2022 (LBT).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/2/2022.(LBT)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-04379. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 29, 2022 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-227 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to USDC for the Southern District of Indiana for inclusion in MDL No. 2570. (jra) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 29, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (jra) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Nanci West. Cook Group Incorporated served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022; Cook Incorporated served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022; Cook Medical Incorporated served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022; Cook Medical, LLC served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cook Incorporated, #2 Affidavit Cook Group Incorporated, #3 Affidavit Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Affidavit Cook Medical LLC)(Daniel, Stephen) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/7/2022. (gas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cook Medical, LLC. (gas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (gas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated. (gas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cook Incorporated. (gas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nanci West. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12172216) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 11/30/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCI WEST
Represented By: Stephen Grant Daniel
Represented By: Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?