MCMURRAY v. BRP US INC et al
Plaintiff: FREDERICK MCMURRAY and FREDERICK MCMURRY
Defendant: BRP US INC, BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC., HJC AMERICA, INC. and BRP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00254
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
2 Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Judge Sarah Evans Barker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:23-cv-00254-MPB-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (CKM)
March 22, 2023 Filing 36 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint , filed by BRP US INC.(Trischler, Clem)
March 22, 2023 Filing 35 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint , filed by BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC..(Trischler, Clem)
March 21, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint , filed by HJC AMERICA, INC..(Trimble, John)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brian Keith Gibson for HJC AMERICA, INC. added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Brian Keith Gibson is ordered to register within ten days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Brian Keith Gibson via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/10/2023. (SWM)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney James C. Ughetta for HJC AMERICA, INC. added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, James C. Ughetta is ordered to register within ten days of the entry of this Order. Copy to James C. Ughetta via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/10/2023. (SWM)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - In light of the filing of the Amended Complaint, [Dkt. #25 ], the motions to dismiss the original complaint, [Dkt. #11 and Dkt. #23 ], are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/10/2023. (SWM)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher Winkler for BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC. and BRP US INC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/9/2023. (SWM)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jason Reefer for BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC. and BRP US INC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/9/2023. (SWM)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Clem C. Trischler for BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC. and BRP US INC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/9/2023. (SWM)
March 9, 2023 Filing 27 Submission of Supplemental Verified Application of Brian Gibson for Pro Hac Vice Admission, filed by Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Trimble, John)
March 9, 2023 Filing 26 Submission of Supplemental Verified Application of James Ughetta for Pro Hac Vice Admission, filed by Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Trimble, John)
March 8, 2023 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FREDERICK MCMURRAY.(King, Robert)
March 8, 2023 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , filed by Defendant BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.. (Schultz, Thomas)
March 8, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Schultz, Thomas)
March 8, 2023 Filing 22 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.. (Bucher, Jonathan)
March 8, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr on behalf of Defendant BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.. (Bucher, Jonathan)
March 8, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Schultz on behalf of Defendant BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.. (Schultz, Thomas)
March 7, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher S. Winkler to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7534608), filed by Defendants BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC., BRP US INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winkler, Christopher)
March 7, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason M. Reefer to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7534579), filed by Defendants BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC., BRP US INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reefer, Jason)
March 7, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Clem C. Trischler to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7534521), filed by Defendants BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC., BRP US INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trischler, Clem)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER taking under advisement Brian Keith Gibson's #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Pursuant to Local Rule 83-6(d)(2), a pro hac vice motion must include a statement indicating whether the attorney requesting admission is currently or has ever been disbarred or suspended from practice before any court, department, bureau or commission of any state or the United States, or has ever received a reprimand or been subject to other disciplinary action from any such court, department, bureau, or commission pertaining to conduct or fitness as a member of the bar. The statement provided by Mr. Gibson does not include the information required by the Local Rule. [Dkt. 14-1 4.] The motion is taken under advisement until a supplemental statement from Mr. Gibson correcting these deficiencies is filed. See Order for additional information. Copy to Brian Keith Gibson via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/3/2023. (SWM)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER taking under advisement James C. Ughetta's #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Pursuant to Local Rule 83-6(d)(2), a pro hac vice motion must include a statement indicating whether the attorney requesting admission is currently or has ever been disbarred or suspended from practice before any court, department, bureau or commission of any state or the United States, or has ever received a reprimand or been subject to other disciplinary action from any such court, department, bureau, or commission pertaining to conduct or fitness as a member of the bar. The statement provided by Mr. Ughetta does not include the information required by the Local Rule. [Dkt. 13-1 4.] The motion is taken under advisement until a supplemental statement from Mr. Ughetta correcting these deficiencies is filed. See Order for additional information. Copy to James C. Ughetta via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/3/2023. (SWM)
March 2, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian Keith Gibson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7527674), filed by Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pro Hac Vice Verification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Trimble, John)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) James C. Ughetta to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7527667), filed by Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pro Hac Vice Verification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Trimble, John)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , filed by Defendant BRP US INC. (Bucher, Jonathan)
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant BRP US INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucher, Jonathan) Modified on 2/17/2023 (CKM).
February 15, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by HJC AMERICA, INC..(Trimble, John)
February 14, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by John Carl Trimble on behalf of Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Trimble, John) Modified on 2/14/2023 (CKM).
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Leonard Abel on behalf of Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Abel, Edmund)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 *** PLEASE DISREGARD SEE DKT #9 *** for CORRECT NOTICE of Appearance by John Carl Trimble on behalf of Defendant HJC AMERICA, INC.. (Trimble, John) Modified on 2/14/2023 (CKM).
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BRP US INC. (Bucher, Jonathan)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Schultz on behalf of Defendant BRP US INC. (Schultz, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr on behalf of Defendant BRP US INC. (Bucher, Jonathan)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion, case number 49D02-2209-CT-33469, filed by BRP US INC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7498214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Article, #3 Exhibit Article, #4 Exhibit Article, #5 Exhibit Consent, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Docket Entries, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bucher, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMURRAY v. BRP US INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK MCMURRAY
Represented By: Robert D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK MCMURRY
Represented By: David R. Thompson
Represented By: Robert D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US INC
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Winkler
Represented By: Jason Reefer
Represented By: Thomas R. Schultz
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.
Represented By: Christopher Winkler
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: Jason Reefer
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas R. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HJC AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Brian Keith Gibson
Represented By: James C. Ughetta
Represented By: Edmund Leonard Abel
Represented By: John Carl Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?