ST-HILAIRE et al v. COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Plaintiff: JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE, MERLANGE MEME, EVENKS MEME, NADEGE JEAN MARIE and L. M.D. M.
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Case Number: 1:2023cv01505
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME - The time in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, shall be enlarged to and including forty-five days after the court has ruled on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The deadline for Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Class Certification in this cause shall be enlarged to and including November 2, 2023, and with Plaintiffs' reply being due November 13, 2023. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/19/2023. (JSR)
October 18, 2023 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 2, 2023 , filed by Defendant COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Bock, William)
October 2, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Doerr on behalf of Defendant COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (Doerr, Adam)
October 2, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bock, III on behalf of Defendant COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (Bock, William)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Continue Preliminary-Injunction Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule Oral Argument Oral Argument is VACATED and RESET to 11/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in room #344, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (SEE ORDER.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/27/2023.(TPS)
September 26, 2023 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Preliminary-Injunction Hearing and Extension of Briefing Schedule, filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Gavin)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER:The oral argument set November 7, 2023 is RESCHEDULED to 11/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in room #344, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Please make note of this change. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/20/2023.(KAA)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. #8 ) is set for oral argument on 11/7/2023 at 4:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #344, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Parties are allotted a total of one hour. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/8/2023.(LBT)
September 8, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy M. DeNardi on behalf of Defendant COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (DeNardi, Betsy)
September 7, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendant COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (Barta, James)
September 5, 2023 Filing 26 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Rose, Gavin)
September 5, 2023 Filing 25 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Rose, Gavin)
September 5, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of Evidence in Support of Pending Motions by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Fed. Reg. - Parole for Venezuelans), #2 Exhibit 2 (Fed. Reg. - Parole for Venezuelans, Update), #3 Exhibit 3 (Fed. Reg. - Parole for Haitians), #4 Exhibit 4 (Fed. Reg. - Parole for Nicaraguans), #5 Exhibit 5 (Fed. Reg. - Parole for Cubans), #6 Exhibit 6 (DHS - Fact Sheet Data), #7 Exhibit 7 (USDOT - Indiana Transp. Data), #8 Exhibit 8 (Aff. of C. Varga)) (Rose, Gavin)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - This cause has come before the Court upon the motion of Tanya Broder, counsel for Plaintiffs, for leave to appear and participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned cause only. Being fully advised, it is now ORDERED that the motion [Filing No. #18 ] be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/1/2023. (CW)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - This cause has come before the Court upon the motion of Chiraayu Gosrani, counsel for Plaintiffs, for leave to appear and participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned cause only. Being fully advised, it is now ORDERED that the motion [Filing No. #17 ] be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/1/2023. (CW)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - This cause has come before the Court upon the motion of Nicholas Espritu, counsel for Plaintiffs, for leave to appear and participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned cause only. Being fully advised, it is now ORDERED that the motion [Filing No. #16 ] be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/1/2023. (CW)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - This cause has come before the Court upon the motion of Lisa S. Graybill, counsel for Plaintiffs, for leave to appear and participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned cause only. Being fully advised, it is now ORDERED that the motion [Filing No. #19 ] be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/1/2023. (CW)
August 31, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lisa S. Graybill to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7791880), filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graybill, Lisa)
August 31, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tanya Broder to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7791877), filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broder, Tanya)
August 31, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chiraayu Gosrani to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7791858), filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gosrani, Chiraayu)
August 31, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Espritu to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7791822), filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Espiritu, Nicholas)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON AUGUST 30, 2023, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel August 30, 2023, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding case status, settlement, and related matters. Plaintiffs shall file briefs in support of the pending motion for class certification and for preliminary injunction by September 5, 2023. Defendant shall file response briefs by October 5, 2023. Plaintiffs shall file any reply briefs by October 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
August 30, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Barta on behalf of Defendant COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (Barta, James)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - This matter is set for a telephonic status conference at 11 a.m. on August 30, 2023, before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The purpose of this conference is to address case status, briefing schedule and settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/28/2023.(JRB)
August 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Order, filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE (Rose, Gavin)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The plaintiffs and the putative class having filed their #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and their #9 Motion for Class Certification. The parties shall contact the Magistrate Judge to schedule a status conference. The purpose of this status conference is to set a briefing schedule on the aforementioned motions. If no attorney has yet appeared to represent the defendant, counsel for the plaintiffs shall promptly serve this order on the defendant and on the Indiana Attorney General. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/25/2023. (CW)
August 25, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Rose, Gavin)
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Setting Status Conference)(Rose, Gavin)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES. (LF)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LF)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LF)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Falk, Kenneth)
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stevie J. Pactor on behalf of Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Pactor, Stevie)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Minor Rose on behalf of Plaintiffs NADEGE JEAN MARIE, L. M.D. M., EVENKS MEME, MERLANGE MEME, JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE. (Rose, Gavin)
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Notice of Challenge to the Constitutionality of State Statute (Verified) against COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7778642) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (BMV Emergency Rule), #2 Exhibit 2 (St-Hilaire Passport Stamp), #3 Exhibit 3 (St-Hilaire Employment Auth.), #4 Exhibit 4 (St-Hilaire BMV Letter), #5 Exhibit 5 (US CBP Summaries), #6 Exhibit 6 (M. Meme, E. Meme & N. Jean Marie Employment Auths.), #7 Exhibit 7 (L.M.D.M. Employment Auth.), #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Rose, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST-HILAIRE et al v. COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFSON ST-HILAIRE
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Represented By: Stevie J. Pactor
Represented By: Gavin Minor Rose
Represented By: Nicholas Espritu
Represented By: Lisa Graybill
Represented By: Chiraayu Gosrani
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERLANGE MEME
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Represented By: Stevie J. Pactor
Represented By: Gavin Minor Rose
Represented By: Chiraayu Gosrani
Represented By: Lisa Graybill
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Nicholas Espritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVENKS MEME
Represented By: Gavin Minor Rose
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Represented By: Stevie J. Pactor
Represented By: Chiraayu Gosrani
Represented By: Lisa Graybill
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Nicholas Espritu
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADEGE JEAN MARIE
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Represented By: Stevie J. Pactor
Represented By: Gavin Minor Rose
Represented By: Chiraayu Gosrani
Represented By: Lisa Graybill
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Nicholas Espritu
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. M.D. M.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Represented By: Stevie J. Pactor
Represented By: Gavin Minor Rose
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Chiraayu Gosrani
Represented By: Lisa Graybill
Represented By: Nicholas Espritu
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE INDIANA BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Represented By: Adam R. Doerr
Represented By: Betsy M. DeNardi
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: William Bock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?