REHFELDT v. GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS et al
Plaintiff: SARAH REHFELDT
Defendant: GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS doing business as GREEN ARROW LOANS, INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN K. SHAW, GREG JONES, JOHN DOES 1-10, GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS, d/b/a GREEN ARROW LOANS and DAN SHAW
Case Number: 1:2023cv01786
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time - The Court finds that good cause exists for the extension request, which is unopposed by Plaintiff, and which was made before each moving defendant's current deadline to respond. The Court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS that the four moving defendants shall have until and including January 9, 2024 to file their response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/22/2023. (AAS)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/9/2024 to respond to complaint, filed by Defendants INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREG JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rooney, Mark)
November 15, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN of Service, filed by SARAH REHFELDT. NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 10/11/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN of Service, filed by SARAH REHFELDT. INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC served on 10/11/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on TUESDAY, JANUARY 16, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Mario Garcia, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/1/2023.(JRB)
October 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Rooney, Mark)
October 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Rooney on behalf of Defendants INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREG JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, DAN SHAW. (Rooney, Mark)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SARAH REHFELDT. GREG JONES waiver sent on 10/24/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SARAH REHFELDT. DAN SHAW waiver sent on 10/24/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 5, 2023 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CW)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (CW)
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (CW)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS, d/b/a GREEN ARROW LOANS, INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, GREG JONES, NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC, and DAN SHAW. (CW)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Goldstein on behalf of Plaintiff SARAH REHFELDT. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Plaintiff SARAH REHFELDT. (Kolbus, Heather)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff SARAH REHFELDT. (Edelman, Daniel)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by SARAH REHFELDT. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7840512) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REHFELDT v. GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH REHFELDT
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS doing business as GREEN ARROW LOANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA IMPACT MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN K. SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG JONES
Represented By: Mark E. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN ARROW SOLUTIONS, d/b/a GREEN ARROW LOANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN SHAW
Represented By: Mark E. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?