EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS v. LENG
Plaintiff: EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD and EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS
Defendant: Jinping Leng and JINPING LENG d/b/a DELOMO
Case Number: 1:2023cv01911
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) and the Plaintiff's #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case has been CLOSED. TEXT-ONLY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry. (TMD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS. (Stohry, Bradley)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of this date, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/22/2023.(AAS)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia: Status Conference held on 11/9/2023. Counsel for defendants fails to appear. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to notify the magistrate judge chambers of the status of any representation for defendants within 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. (NAD)
November 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Christopher Reichel on behalf of Plaintiff EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS. (Reichel, Mark)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS re #12 Scheduling Order, #11 Order on Motion, #1 Complaint, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Summons Issued, #6 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #7 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 4(f)(3) (Stohry, Bradley)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/9/2023 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. Counsel for Plaintiff is instructed to serve notice of this order on Defendant. The purpose of the conference is to discuss Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Dkt #5 . Counsel shall attend the conference by calling 888-363-4734, Access Code 1125419, Security Code 231911. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a Certificate of Service after serving Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/31/2023. (JSR)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #7 is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall effectuate service by emailing copies of the Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and other relevant documents to: (1) the email address supplied by Defendant to Amazon (legal@dyproip.com); and (2) the email address of U.S. counsel for Defendant who K&K's counsel has previously corresponded with on this matter (haoyichen@archlakelaw.com). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file a Certificate of Service. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/31/2023. (JSR)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
October 26, 2023 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
October 26, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to JINPING LENG d/b/a DELOMO. (JRB)
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 4(f)(3), filed by Plaintiff EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stohry Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stohry, Bradley)
October 25, 2023 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mohammedi Declaration, #2 Affidavit Stohry Declaration, #3 Affidavit Reichel Declaration)(Stohry, Bradley)
October 25, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stohry, Bradley)
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD. (Stohry, Bradley)
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Stohry on behalf of Plaintiff EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD. (Stohry, Bradley)
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Jinping Leng. (Stohry, Bradley)
October 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jinping Leng, filed by EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7869661) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Patent, #3 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit C - Amazon Report, #5 Exhibit D - Stohry Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Email Chain Between Counsel)(Stohry, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS v. LENG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD
Represented By: Bradley M. Stohry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXCELENCIA IMPORTING PTY LTD d/b/a KENNELS & KATS
Represented By: Bradley M. Stohry
Represented By: Mark Christopher Reichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinping Leng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JINPING LENG d/b/a DELOMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?