SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL, LLC v. NEXXT SPINE, LLC
Plaintiff: Secada Medical LLC d/b/a Ventris Medical, LLC and SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL
Defendant: Nexxt Spine, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01960
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: M Kendra Klump
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL, filed by NEXXT SPINE, LLC.(Craig, Darren)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Clark on behalf of Defendant NEXXT SPINE, LLC. (Clark, Matthew)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Vincent J. Badolato for SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 11/21/2023. Copy to Vincent J. Badolato via US mail. (JSR)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Peter J. Willsey for SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 11/21/2023. Copy to Peter Willsey via US mail. (JSR)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Katherine C. Dearing for SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL added. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to distribution list via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 11/21/2023. (JRB)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent J. Badolato to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7910012), filed by Plaintiff SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Samuel)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter J. Willsey to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7909988), filed by Plaintiff SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Samuel)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine C. Dearing to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7909904), filed by Plaintiff SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Samuel)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by NEXXT SPINE, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant NEXXT SPINE, LLC, re #1 Complaint. (Craig, Darren)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Andrew Craig on behalf of Defendant NEXXT SPINE, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL. (Gardner, Samuel)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (TPS)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (TPS)
November 2, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (TPS)
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NEXXT SPINE, LLC. (TPS)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gardner on behalf of Plaintiff Secada Medical LLC d/b/a Ventris Medical, LLC. (Gardner, Samuel)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nexxt Spine, LLC, filed by Secada Medical LLC d/b/a Ventris Medical, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7880216) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Gardner, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2023 (party correction as requested by filer via phone (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL, LLC v. NEXXT SPINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secada Medical LLC d/b/a Ventris Medical, LLC
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECADA MEDICAL LLC d/b/a VENTRIS MEDICAL
Represented By: Katherine C. Dearing
Represented By: Peter J. Willsey
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: Vincent J. Badolato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexxt Spine, LLC
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?