LOUCK v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANGIE LOUCK
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC., SANDOZ INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., HOSPIRA, INC, SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, INC. and CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES LTD.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02000
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: M Kendra Klump
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark R. Niemeyer to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7965559), filed by Plaintiff ANGIE LOUCK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Niemeyer, Mark)
December 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.. (Northrip, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:23-cv-02000-JPH-MKK, on all future filings in this matter. (CCG)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENTS: The Court, sua sponte, now orders the above-captioned cases reassigned due to the requirements of workload pursuant to S.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(f). The Clerk is directed to reassign each case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump as the referral judge. No presiding judge reassignment shall occur. See Order. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/27/2023.(LF)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ladene Ivone Mendoza on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.. (Mendoza, Ladene)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.. (Larson, Joel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.. (Larson, Joel)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (KAA)
November 7, 2023 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-13301. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Indiana Southern. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Niemeyer, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Niemeyer, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 24, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6490547) filed by Angie Louck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)Attorney Mark R. Niemeyer added to party Angie Louck(pty:pla).(Niemeyer, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOUCK v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGIE LOUCK
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael S. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?