MAHANEY et al v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARY MAHANEY and JAMES MAHANEY, JR.
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, SUN PHARAMCEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA, INC, SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE and CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02007
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: M Kendra Klump
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Northrip, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:23-cv-02007-TWP-MKK, on all future filings in this matter. (CCG)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/27/2023. (SNB)
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ladene Ivone Mendoza on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Mendoza, Ladene)
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Larson, Joel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Larson, Joel)
November 7, 2023 Filing 17 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (TPS)
November 7, 2023 Filing 16 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (TPS)
November 7, 2023 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01178. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 12 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(jjs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharma Global FZE filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Hospira, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6643164) filed by James Mahaney, Mary Mahaney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Andrew Thomas Kagan added to party James Mahaney(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Thomas Kagan added to party Mary Mahaney(pty:pla).(Kagan, Andrew) Modified on 2/22/2018 (jjs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAHANEY et al v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARAMCEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MAHANEY
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Kagan
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MAHANEY, JR.
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Kagan
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?