STEWART v. SANOFI S.A. et al
Plaintiff: BONNIE STEWART
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI S.A., AVENTIS PHARMA S.A., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC. and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv02062
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mario Garcia
2 Judge: M Kendra Klump
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Northrip, William)
December 15, 2023 Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BONNIE STEWART. (Hammond, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allen Hammond on behalf of Plaintiff BONNIE STEWART. (Hammond, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:23-cv-02062-SEB-MKK, on all future filings in this matter. (CCG)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENTS: The Court, sua sponte, now orders the above-captioned cases reassigned due to the requirements of workload pursuant to S.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(f). The Clerk is directed to reassign each case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump as the referral judge. No presiding judge reassignment shall occur. See Order. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/27/2023.(LF)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ladene Ivone Mendoza on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Mendoza, Ladene)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. identifying SANOFI S.A. as Corporate Parent of SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC as Corporate Parent of SANOFI US SERVICES INC. (Larson, Joel) Modified on 11/27/2023 to identify corporate parents (LBT).
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Larson, Joel)
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LBT)
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-10102. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Indiana Southern. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (ss) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6394302) filed by Bonnie Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Rashmi Parthasarathi added to party Bonnie Stewart(pty:pla).(Parthasarathi, Rashmi) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART v. SANOFI S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jousef M. Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE STEWART
Represented By: Alyssa White
Represented By: Russell W Lewis, IV
Represented By: Pierce Jones
Represented By: Rashmi Parthasarathi
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?