GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC. v. SWIMSUITS FOR ALL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.
Defendant: SWIMSUITS FOR ALL, LLC, FULLBEAUTY BRANDS OPERATIONS, LLC, JESSICA LONDON, INC. and FULLBEAUTY BRANDS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00611
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (BAA)
April 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Alyson M. Kern hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Kern, Alyson)
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson M. Kern on behalf of Plaintiff GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.. (Kern, Alyson)
April 8, 2024 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (BAA)
April 8, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (BAA)
April 8, 2024 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (BAA)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.. (Rykovich, Brittney)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.. (Rykovich, Brittney)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.. (Rykovich, Brittney)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney B. Rykovich on behalf of Plaintiff GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.. (Rykovich, Brittney)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8104707) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rykovich, Brittney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC. v. SWIMSUITS FOR ALL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLOBAL TRADEMARKS, INC.
Represented By: Brittney B. Rykovich
Represented By: Alyson M. Fosnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWIMSUITS FOR ALL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLBEAUTY BRANDS OPERATIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA LONDON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLBEAUTY BRANDS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?