HOWARTH v. MY SAUNA WORLD LLC
Plaintiff: MORGAN HOWARTH
Defendant: MY SAUNA WORLD LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00734
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Kellie M Barr
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff MORGAN HOWARTH . (Aragona, Renee)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - granting #15 Motion for Continuance of the Initial Pretrial Conference. The Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for June 27, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. is RESET to 7/1/2024 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 6/24/2024.(KAA)
June 19, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff MORGAN HOWARTH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aragona, Renee)
June 18, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Malcolm on behalf of Defendant MY SAUNA WORLD LLC. (Malcolm, Matthew)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (TIME ONLY): The Court on its own motion RESETS the START TIME ONLY for the June 27, 2024, Initial Pretrial Conference from 3:00 p.m. (Eastern) to instead start at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The conference will still be held on Zoom, and the Court will contact counsel by separate email with the information needed to participate in the conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 6/18/2024.(LF)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Zoom Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2024 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel by separate email with information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully--it sets out expectations for the conference as well as the undersigned's typical Practices & Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 6/4/2024.(SWM)
May 30, 2024 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by MY SAUNA WORLD LLC. (Rutherford, Mark)
May 30, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MY SAUNA WORLD LLC.(Rutherford, Mark)
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Rutherford on behalf of Defendant MY SAUNA WORLD LLC. (Rutherford, Mark)
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by MORGAN HOWARTH. MY SAUNA WORLD LLC served on 5/9/2024. (Sanders, Craig)
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Appearance) (AAS)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MY SAUNA WORLD LLC. (AAS)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (AAS)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Jennifer Aragona on behalf of Plaintiff MORGAN HOWARTH. (Aragona, Renee)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig B. Sanders on behalf of Plaintiff MORGAN HOWARTH. (Sanders, Craig)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MY SAUNA WORLD LLC, filed by MORGAN HOWARTH. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8138592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Photograph, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARTH v. MY SAUNA WORLD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORGAN HOWARTH
Represented By: Renee Jennifer Aragona
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MY SAUNA WORLD LLC
Represented By: Mark W. Rutherford
Represented By: Matthew Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?