MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE et al v. WOMACK CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS and MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE
Defendant: WOMACK CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION
Case Number: 1:2024cv00837
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: M Kendra Klump
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to WOMACK CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Clerk, Roger A.G. Sharpe. Copy sent to distribution list via US Mail (JRB)
June 18, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Schwartz, Donald)
June 4, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Schwartz, Donald)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (TPS)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WOMACK CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION. (TPS)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8169421) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Memorandum Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE et al v. WOMACK CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOMACK CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?