CLINTON v. MARBERRY et al
Plaintiff: |
JACQUES CLINTON |
Defendant: |
H. J. MARBERRY, R. GALILION and LT. BRACE |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00104 |
Filed: |
April 18, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Terre Haute Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Magnus-Stinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 6, 2012 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting 22 Defendant Gallion's Motion for Summary Judgment. The consequence of Clinton's failure to properly exhaust his administrative remedies as to the December 2009 claim, is that such claim should not have been brought an d must now be dismissed without prejudice. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim resolved in this Entry. The claim that Defendant Lt. Brace violated Clinton's constitutional rights in connection with a move from one cell to another on November 3, 2009, shall proceed. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/6/2012. (RSF)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
27
ENTRY denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment - Consistent with the foregoing (SEE ENTRY), therefore, and noting that the defendants' motion for summary judgment is not even fully briefed at this point, the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 24 is DENIED without prejudice. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/6/2011. (JKS)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
2
Entry Dismissing Insufficient Claimsand Directing Further Proceedings; legally insufficient claims asserted in the complaint filed by Jacques Clinton are dismissed, while other claims will proceed as directed. Claims against Warden Marberry are dismissed ; No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claims resolved in this Entry; Claims against Lt. Brace and R. Galilion in their individual capacities shall proceed. Clinton shall have through May 31, 2011, to either pay $350.00 filing fee or demonstrate that he lacks financial ability to do so; The clerk shall issue process to these defendants. Process shall consist of a summons. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summo ns, together with a copy of the complaint and a copy of this Entry, on the defendants and on the officials designated pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 4(i)(2) and 4(i)(3) at the expense of the United States. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/5/2011.(see entry for details) (served by us mail)(VS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?