HERRON v. LOCKETT et al
Plaintiff: |
BRIAN HERRON |
Defendant: |
CHARLES L. LOCKETT and D. MEYER |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00109 |
Filed: |
March 22, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Terre Haute Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Magnus-Stinson |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Hussmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 9, 2015 |
Filing
97
Entry - Granting 63 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Vacating Status Conference, and Directing Entry of Final Judgment. For the reasons explained in this Entry, the defendant's motion for summary judgment [dkt. 63] is granted, o n the basis of qualified immunity. Lt. Meyer is entitled to summary judgment as a matter of law on the basis of qualified immunity. Lt. Meyer's motion for summary judgment [dkt. 63] is GRANTED. Judgment consistent with this Entry and with the Entry of May 14, 2013, shall now issue. The status conference set for March 20, 2015, is VACATED. (See Entry.) Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/9/2015. (RSF)
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
45
ENTRY - The plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel has been considered. The plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 44 is denied. (See Entry.) Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/21/2014. (RSF)
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
38
Entry Discussing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Directing Further Proceedings - For the reasons explained in this Entry, the defendant's motion to dismiss 22 is granted in part and denied in part. The plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 36 is denied. Lt. Meyer shall have through March 17, 2014, in which to file his answer to the complaint, in which deliberate indifference is the only remaining claim. (See Entry.) Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/20/2014. (RSF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?