STEVENS v. YARBER et al
Plaintiff: |
GARY ERVIN STEVENS, JR. |
Defendant: |
DICK BROWN, COMMISSIONER OF INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SUPERINTENDENT and R. YARBER |
Miscellaneous: |
WVCF (Court Use Only) |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00074 |
Filed: |
February 29, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Terre Haute Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
William T. Lawrence |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
37
Entry Denying Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice: Consistent with Rule 56(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure the following steps shall be taken to remedy the parties failure to properly support or address this fact: 1) the motion for summary judgment [dkt. 18 ] is denied without prejudice; 2) Officer Yarber shall have through February 3, 2017, in which to submit evidence to support the assertion that Mr. Steven was informed of the grievance process; and 3) Mr. Stevens shall have through February 21, 2017, in which to respond to Officer Yarber's evidence and to submit evidence in support of his claim that he did not know what he was required to do to complete the grievance process ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 1/20/2017. (DW)
|
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
7
Entry Discussing Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The official capacity claims against the Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Correction, the Superintendent of Wabash Valley Correctional Facility and Officer Yarber are dismissed . The claim against Superintendent Dick Brown in his individual capacity is also dismissed because there are no allegations of wrong doing on his part. The clerk is directed to terminate the Commissioner and Superintendent and Dick Brown as defenda nts on the docket. The only remaining defendant is R. Yarber in his individual capacity. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c) (3), to issue and serve process on the defendant Correctional Officer R. Yarber. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/1/2016. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. (GSO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?