HEFFERN v. STATE OF INDIANA
Petitioner: |
MICHAEL P. HEFFERN |
Respondent: |
DICK BROWN and STATE OF INDIANA |
Miscellaneous: |
WVCF (Court Use Only) |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00410 |
Filed: |
August 28, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Terre Haute Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry J. McKinney |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 13, 2018 |
Filing
40
Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus And Denying a Certificate of Appealability - Petitioner Michael P. Heffern is serving a 75-year sentence for his 2010 Jay County, Indiana convictions for murder and robbery. This Court has carefully reviewed the state record in light of Mr. Heffern's claims and has given such consideration to those claims as the limited scope of its review in a habeas corpus proceeding permits. Having applied the appropriate standard of review, and havi ng considered the pleadings and the record, Mr. Heffern's petition for writ of habeas corpus must be denied. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. The Court therefore denies a certificate of appealability. (See Order.) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/13/2018. (DMW)
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
35
Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus And Denying a Certificate of Appealability - Petitioner Michael P. Heffern is serving a 75-year sentence for his 2010 Jay County, Indiana convictions for murder and robbery. He brings this petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. This Court has carefully reviewed the state record in light of Mr. Heffern's claims and has given such consideration to those claims as the limited scope of its review in a habeas corpus proceeding permits. Having applied the appropriate standard of review, and having considered the pleadings and the record, Mr. Heffern's petition for writ of habeas corpus must be denied. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. The Court therefore denies a certificate of appealability. (See Order.) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/3/2018. (DMW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?