AL-KASSAR v. BUREAU OF PRISONS et al.
Plaintiff: MONZER AL-KASSAR
Defendant: AMY ADAMS, BUREAU OF PRISONS, N. COLE, FNU DUBBINS, FRANK HART, S. JULIAN, EVELYN KELLER, D. MATTHEWS, FNU MCCOY, CORY MILLER, FNU RIGSBY, FNU RODRIGUEZ, ROBERT ROLOFF, M. SAMPLE, FNU SULLIVAN, CLINT SWIFT and UNKNOWN PARTY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00086
Filed: February 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Doris L. Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF EXHAUSTION AFTER PAVEY HEARING - The motion in limine, dkt. 162 , is denied in part and granted in part, consistent with the Court's discussion of how it weighed the evidence throughout this Entry. The defendants' affirmative defense of failure to exhaust available administrative remedies relating to Mr. Al-Kassar's Bivens claims is sustained. The Bivens claims are dismissed without prejudice. This leaves for resolut ion the Federal Tort Claim Act claim. The parties shall have through April 9, 2021, in which to report whether it would be beneficial to set the matter for a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge. If a settlement conference is not requ ested, the parties shall have through April 30, 2021, in which to either file a dispositive motion on the Federal Tort Claim Act claim or report that genuine issues of material facts preclude such a filing. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, briefing shall proceed in accordance with Local Rule 56-1. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/31/2021. (KAA)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO RECONSIDER - Plaintiff's motion to reconsider the dismissal of and reinstate the retaliation claim, dkt. 104 , is GRANTED to the extent that whether the plaintiff exhausted his administrative remedies with respect to the retaliation claim asserted against defendant Keller will also be addressed during the Pavey hearing, to be scheduled in a separate Order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/16/2020. (KAA)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ENTRY DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL STAY OF PROCEEDINGSAND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The Court agrees that a Pavey hearing will likely present complicated logistical issues and a great deal of expense for the parties and the Court, but Defendant s are the ones who have asserted that affirmative defense. There is no basis to potentially preclude the plaintiff from litigating his Bivens claims simply because Defendants' exhaustion defense is a burden for Defendants to litigate. Defenda nts' motion for partial stay of proceedings, dkt. 96 , is denied. Defendants shall have January 24, 2020, in which to notify the Court of their decision to either a) proceed with a Pavey hearing, or b) withdraw the exhaustion defense. (See Entry.) Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/20/2019. (RSF)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY Discussing Complaint, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, And Directing Service of Process - The clerk is designated pursuant to Rule 4 (c)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to issue process to defendants S. Julian, FNU Rigsby, M. Sam ple, Clint Swift, Evelyn Keller, FNU Rodriguez, Robert Roloff, FNU McCoy, FNU Dubbins, Cory Miller, FNU Sullivan, Frank Hart, and Amy Adams, and the officials designated pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1) and 4 (i)(3). Process shall consist of a summon s, which shall be served with a copy of the complaint filed on February 26, 2018, docket 1, and a copy of this Entry, by the Marshal for this District or his deputy, at the expense of the United States. Because the plaintiff is proceeding, in part, under the theory recognized in Bivens v. Six Unknown Named Agents of Federal Bureau of Narcotics, 403 U.S. 388 (1971), personal service is required. Robinson v. Turner, 15 F.3d 82 (7th Cir. 1994). The clerk shall update the docket to di smiss and terminate defendants Federal Bureau of Prisons, D. Matthews, N. Cole, and the Unknown Correctional Officers (SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 5/24/2018. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. (DW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AL-KASSAR v. BUREAU OF PRISONS et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU DUBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. JULIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVELYN KELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU MCCOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORY MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU RIGSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT ROLOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. SAMPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINT SWIFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN PARTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONZER AL-KASSAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?