LOPEZ v. NORTHVIEW CHURCH et al
Plaintiff: JAIME C. LOPEZ
Defendant: ROBERT HOFFMAN, STEVE POE, DEREK IRVINE, MARK CRULL and NORTHVIEW CHURCH
Case Number: 2:2018cv00347
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number ( 2:18-cv-347-JRS-MJD), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JD)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Entry on In Forma Pauperis Status - On August 10, 2018, the Court ordered the plaintiff to file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action or to pay the $400.00 filing fee. The plaintiff has failed to do so or otherwise respond by the deadline. The plaintiff shall have through October 15, 2018, to comply with the Court's previous order or to explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/18/2018. (DMW)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JAIME C. LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through September 10, 2018, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so. If he seeks leave to proceed in forma pauperis, his request must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on August 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/10/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE LIABLE, SLANDEROUS, DEFAMING ACT AGAINST ME BY DEFENDANTS against MARK CRULL, ROBERT HOFFMAN, DEREK IRVINE, NORTHVIEW CHURCH, STEVE POE, filed by JAIME C. LOPEZ. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPEZ v. NORTHVIEW CHURCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME C. LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE POE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK IRVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CRULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHVIEW CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?