MAYFIELD v. BROWN

Plaintiff: CAMERON MAYFIELD
Defendant: JOHN DOE, ONE, JOHN DOE, TWO and RICHARD BROWN
Case Number: 2:2018cv00360
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Terre Haute Office
0 Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
1 Judge: William T Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 9 NOTICE of Entry of Payment, filed by Plaintiff CAMERON MAYFIELD (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JRB)
September 14, 2018 8 RECEIPT #IP062079 for partial filing fee in the amount of $4.33, paid by Plaintiff. (DJH)
August 29, 2018 7 Documents for Service by IDOC TO: Richard Brown - re #1 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk. (DWH)
August 29, 2018 6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk TO: Richard Brown. (DWH)
August 29, 2018 5 Entry Granting Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $4.33. The plaintiff shall have through September 28, 2018, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The claims against unknown John Doe defendants must be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The clerk shall add Richard Brown as a defendant and the clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 (c)(3), to issue and serve process on Warden Brown in the manner specified by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(1). Process in this case shall consist of the complaint, applicable forms and this Entry. The clerk is directed to include a copy of the prisoner civil rights complaint form along with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry (SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/29/2018. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. (Attachments: #1 copy of the prisoner civil rights complaint form) (DWH)
August 23, 2018 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CAMERON MAYFIELD. (DWH)
August 15, 2018 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 15, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CAMERON MAYFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Trust Statement)(REO)
August 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, ONE, JOHN DOE, TWO, filed by CAMERON MAYFIELD. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Complaint documents)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAYFIELD v. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON MAYFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, ONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, TWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?