WOLF v. HOBSON et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT L. WOLF
Defendant: KIMBERLY HOBSON, SAMUEL BYRD, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY and MARY ANN CHAVEZ
Case Number: 2:2018cv00453
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William T Lawrence
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Entry Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. #6 , is granted. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Two Dollars and Eighteen Cents ($2.18). He shall have through December 14, 2018, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/14/2018. (DMW)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff SCOTT L. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JDC)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by SCOTT L. WOLF located at ISP. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by SCOTT L. WOLF to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JDC)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Entry Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through November 10, 2018, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/11/2018. (DMW)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against SAMUEL BYRD, MARY ANN CHAVEZ, KIMBERLY HOBSON, filed by SCOTT L. WOLF. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 USM 285 Form, #3 Proposed Summons)(REO)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by SCOTT L. WOLF located at ISP. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by SCOTT L. WOLF to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOLF v. HOBSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY HOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL BYRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ANN CHAVEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT L. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?