BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC, et al v. BIG SCOOPS INC., et al

Plaintiff: BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC and BR IP HOLDER LLC
Defendant: BIG SCOOPS INC. and DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00075
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/15/2019. Parties reported that resolution has been reached. Therefore, all pending motions are now DENIED AS MOOT & all previously ordered dates are VACATED. Within 30 days, parties shall file for dismissal. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of David M.Glasgow, Jr. by All Defendants. (Friedrich, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 Exhibit List , filed by Defendants BIG SCOOPS INC., DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR. (Friedrich, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 Witness List , filed by Defendants BIG SCOOPS INC., DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR. (Friedrich, David)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. (See Order for additional information.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/4/2019. (DMW)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is before the Court on #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court establishes the following schedule to prepare this matter for a hearing on that motion. Further instructions regarding the preliminary injunction hearing will be provided by separate order. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/1/2019. (GD)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 2/25/2019. Court & parties discussed schedule to address #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court will enter schedule, by separate order, to address preparation for hearing on that motion. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 11:15 AM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Witness and Exhibit Lists , filed by Plaintiff BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gary Zullig)(Sharpe, Felix) Modified on 3/4/2019 to edit document title(DMW).
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. BIG SCOOPS INC. served on 2/20/2019; DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR served on 2/20/2019. (Sharpe, Felix)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Friedrich on behalf of Defendants BIG SCOOPS INC., DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR. (Friedrich, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service, filed by Plaintiffs BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC, BR IP HOLDER LLC, re #11 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Mark Selent, #2 Exhibit 2- Emails) (Sharpe, Felix)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is set for an in-person pretrial conference on Monday, February 25, 2019 at 11:45 a.m. (Eastern) in Courtroom 131, United States Courthouse, 921 Ohio Street, Terre Haute, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of the conference is to discuss a schedule regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. [Dkt. #3 ]. Counsel for Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to personally serve copies of this order, along with copies of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief [Dkt. #1 ] and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. #3 ], upon Defendant David Glasgow and the registered agent for Defendant Big Scoops Inc., and to file proof of such personal service on both Defendants on or before February 20, 2019. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/14/2019. (DMW)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DMW)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - This cause comes before the Court upon the motion for Felix H. Sharpe to appear and participate pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cause only. [Dkt. #4 .] The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS the Motion. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Felix H. Sharpe is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. (See Order.) Copy to PHV applicant via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/14/2019. (DMW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (DMW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BIG SCOOPS INC., DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR. (DMW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC. (Zelli, Anthony)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Felix H. Sharpe, II to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5284046), filed by Plaintiff BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zelli, Anthony)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement memo in support of preliminary injunction, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1 Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 Notices to Cure, #5 Exhibit 3 Notice to Terminate, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Zelli, Anthony)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Zelli on behalf of Plaintiff BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC. (Zelli, Anthony)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages & Injunctive Relief against BIG SCOOPS INC., filed by BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5282668) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement Motion & Combined Memo for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #6 Supplement Corp. Disclosure Statement, #7 Supplement PHV motion, #8 Exhibit 1 to PHV motion, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Zelli, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC, et al v. BIG SCOOPS INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC
Represented By: Anthony M. Zelli
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP HOLDER LLC
Represented By: Anthony M. Zelli
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG SCOOPS INC.
Represented By: David P. Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID M. GLASGOW, JR.
Represented By: David P. Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?