PRUITT v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: RAYMOND PRUITT
Defendant: PEREZ, OMAR AHMAD, DIVISION OF CLINICAL HEALTH CARE, MICHAEL SMITH, SUSAN MOOTHERY, K. HARTZELL, RYAN SCHNARR, B. SMITH and SPANDENBIND
Case Number: 2:2019cv00164
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Clarification, filed by Plaintiff RAYMOND PRUITT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(DMW)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff Raymond Pruitt's motion requesting the status of this case, dkt. #10 , is GRANTED. The clerk shall include a copy of the docket with Mr. Pruitt's copy of this order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet) (DMW)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Status of Case, filed by Plaintiff RAYMOND PRUITT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DMW)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as undeliverable. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. Out to Court. #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to RAYMOND PRUITT, Putnamville Correctional Facility, 1946 West US Hwy 40, Greencastle, IN 46135. (DMW)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of Photos, filed by Plaintiff RAYMOND PRUITT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #6 , is GRANTED. No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/10/2019. (DMW)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RAYMOND PRUITT. (Attachments: #1 Offender Trust Account)(MAT)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against OMAR AHMAD, DIVISION OF CLINICAL HEALTH CARE, K. HARTZELL, SUSAN MOOTHERY, PEREZ, RYAN SCHNARR, B. SMITH, MICHAEL SMITH, SPANDENBIND, filed by RAYMOND PRUITT. (MAT)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is DENIED as presented. He shall have until May 16, 2019, in which to renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on April 4, 2019. Otherwise, the plaintiff must pay the $400.00 filing fee. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/17/2019. (DMW)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RAYMOND PRUITT. (REO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OMAR AHMAD, DIVISION OF CLINICAL HEALTH CARE, K. HARTZELL, SUSAN MOOTHERY, PEREZ, RYAN SCHNARR, B. SMITH, MICHAEL SMITH, SPANDENBIND, filed by RAYMOND PRUITT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRUITT v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMAR AHMAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVISION OF CLINICAL HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN MOOTHERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. HARTZELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN SCHNARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPANDENBIND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND PRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?