ARNOLD v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Plaintiff: Mr. JOHN ARNOLD and JOHN ARNOLD
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00212
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Jurisdictional Statement Joint Jurisdictional Statement by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Johnson, Erin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - The parties are directed to file within twenty-one days of this order a joint jurisdictional statement explaining why the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. If the parties cannot agree that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, they should file competing jurisdictional statements within that same time period. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/20/2019. (DMW)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes - Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and S.D. Ind. L.R. 37-1(a), counsel must confer in good faith to resolve a discovery dispute before involving the court in the dispute. If counsel have exhausted those efforts without resolving the dispute they must seek a discovery conference with the magistrate judge before the filing of a formal motion to compel or contested motion for protective order in the manner set forth. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/18/2019. (DMW)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/18/2019. (DMW)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on June 12, 2019. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on July 11, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. In addition, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on July 26, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC . (Johnson, Erin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL MOTORS LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for GENERAL MOTORS LLC.. (Johnson, Erin)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on June 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (EST), before the Honorable Doris L. Pryor, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order for additional information and deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/13/2019. (DMW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (DMW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (LAB) (DMW)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC.(Johnson, Erin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Johnson, Erin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Submission of Attachments to Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Record, Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Certified Mail Return, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Erin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Vigo County, case number 84D02-1904-CT-002427, filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5411361) (Johnson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARNOLD v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. JOHN ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ARNOLD
Represented By: John P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: Erin S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?