SPIRTAS COMPANY v. UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SPIRTAS COMPANY, D/B/A SPIRTAS WRECKING COMPANY and SPIRTAS COMPANY
Defendant: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00264
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SPIRTAS COMPANY. UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/7/2019. (Goodman, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPIRTAS COMPANY. (Goodman, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (DMW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SPIRTAS COMPANY. (LAB) (DMW)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by SPIRTAS COMPANY, D/B/A SPIRTAS WRECKING COMPANY. (Goodman, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Goodman on behalf of Plaintiff SPIRTAS COMPANY, D/B/A SPIRTAS WRECKING COMPANY. (Goodman, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by SPIRTAS COMPANY, D/B/A SPIRTAS WRECKING COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5469074) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPIRTAS COMPANY v. UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPIRTAS COMPANY, D/B/A SPIRTAS WRECKING COMPANY
Represented By: David B. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPIRTAS COMPANY
Represented By: David B. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?