DUNAWAY v. DROZDOWSKI et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT DUNAWAY
Defendant: JULIAN DROZDOWSKI and FTI HOLDINGS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00308
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by ROBERT DUNAWAY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGlone, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Discovery due by 6/19/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/21/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Plaintiff shall file overdue response to Notice of Removal, as required by Local Rule 81-1(b), on or before August 28, 2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (DMW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants JULIAN DROZDOWSKI, FTI HOLDINGS . (English, Katherine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff ROBERT DUNAWAY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGlone, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendants JULIAN DROZDOWSKI, FTI HOLDINGS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Katherine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Pfleging, Lesley)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant JULIAN DROZDOWSKI. (Pfleging, Lesley)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant JULIAN DROZDOWSKI. (English, Katherine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by FTI HOLDINGS.(Pfleging, Lesley)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is scheduled for a telephonic initial pretrial conference on Wednesday, August 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/17/2019. (DMW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTI HOLDINGS identifying Corporate Parent 8815623 Canada Inc. for FTI HOLDINGS.. (English, Katherine)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to July 26, 2019 , filed by Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit docket text(DMW).
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (DMW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Submission State Court Records and Docket Sheet, filed by Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Docket Sheet)(English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (Pfleging, Lesley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Submission Exhibit B - Complaint, filed by Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Putnam Circuit Court, case number 67C01-1905-CT-000290, filed by FTI HOLDINGS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5504260) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand Letter)(English, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNAWAY v. DROZDOWSKI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIAN DROZDOWSKI
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Represented By: Katherine Lee English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTI HOLDINGS
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Represented By: Katherine Lee English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DUNAWAY
Represented By: Daniel John McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?