BOURGEOIS v. WARDEN et al
Petitioner: ALFRED BOURGEOIS
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and WARDEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00392
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Regarding Execution Protocol Litigation filed pursuant to Order at #8 , filed by Petitioner ALFRED BOURGEOIS (Williams, Peter) Modified on 9/30/2019 (RSF).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Periodic Updates Regarding Execution Protocol Litigation - Petitioner is party to ongoing litigation regarding the federal execution protocol in the United States District Court of the District of Columbia. Petitioner shall file a notice with the Court on September 30, 2019, and every ninety days thereafter setting forth the status of that litigation and how, if at all, it impacts any issues in this litigation. If Petitioner's execution date is stayed in that litigation, Petitioner shall have seven days from the date the stay is issued to file a notice with the Court informing it of the stay. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/29/2019.(RSF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Camille Offenhauser on behalf of Respondents UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WARDEN. (Offenhauser, Paula)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Reitz on behalf of Respondents UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WARDEN. (Reitz, Brian)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Petitioner Alfred Bourgeois filed this habeas action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 in which he challenges his death sentence and moves to stay his execution. This action will proceed as follows. The United States has already been notified of the filing of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. It shall have through October 18, 2019, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by Mr. Bourgeois should not be granted. Mr. Bourgeois shall have through November 15, 2019, in which to reply. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/22/2019.(RSF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Konrad Williams on behalf of Plaintiff ALFRED BOURGEOIS. (Williams, Peter)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Execution, filed by Plaintiff ALFRED BOURGEOIS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Williams, Peter)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff ALFRED BOURGEOIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Account Statement)(Williams, Peter)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by ALFRED BOURGEOIS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-1, #2 Appendix A-2, #3 Appendix A-3, #4 Appendix B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOURGEOIS v. WARDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Paula Camille Offenhauser
Represented By: Brian L. Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Represented By: Paula Camille Offenhauser
Represented By: Brian L. Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALFRED BOURGEOIS
Represented By: Peter Konrad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?