H-D U.S.A., LLC et al v. HARLEY LIFE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: H-D U.S.A., LLC and HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC
Defendant: HARLEY LIFE, LLC and BILL LEMON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00578
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Feb. 14, 2020 , filed by Defendants HARLEY LIFE, LLC, BILL LEMON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doll, Aaron)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time - The telephonic initial pretrial conference is CONTINUED to February 24, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel must file a Proposed Case Management Plan no fewer than seven (7) days before the Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/9/2020.(KAA)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to in which to #16 Scheduling Order (Parties to file proposed CMP and participate in Initial Pretrial Conference), filed by Plaintiffs H-D U.S.A., LLC, HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File - Defendants shall have to and including January 31, 2020 by which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/30/2019. (KAA)
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/31/2020 , filed by Defendants HARLEY LIFE, LLC, BILL LEMON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doll, Aaron)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 1/17/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/26/2019.(KAA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARLEY LIFE, LLC. (Doll, Aaron)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice E. Doll on behalf of Defendants HARLEY LIFE, LLC, BILL LEMON. (Doll, Maurice)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Doll on behalf of Defendants HARLEY LIFE, LLC, BILL LEMON. (Doll, Aaron)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KAA)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Ashley Elizabeth Hart hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Hart, Ashley)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BILL LEMON. (KAA)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to HARLEY LIFE, LLC. (KAA)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 2:19-cv-000578-JPH-DLP, on all future filings in this matter. (RSF)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/2/2019. (GD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Hart on behalf of Plaintiffs H-D U.S.A., LLC, HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC. (Hart, Ashley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H-D U.S.A., LLC, HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC. for H-D U.S.A., LLC, HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC.. (Hensel, David)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hensel on behalf of Plaintiffs H-D U.S.A., LLC, HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC. (Hensel, David)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5745444) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hensel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H-D U.S.A., LLC et al v. HARLEY LIFE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-D U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Hart
Represented By: David J. Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Hart
Represented By: David J. Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARLEY LIFE, LLC
Represented By: Aaron D. Doll
Represented By: Maurice E. Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL LEMON
Represented By: Aaron D. Doll
Represented By: Maurice E. Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?