UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $43,860.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
In Re: $43,860.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2019mc00005
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The appearance of Special Assistant United States Attorney Eric P. Babbs is entered as counsel for the United States of America. The appearance of Assistant United States Attorney John E. Childress is WITHDRAWN and TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/26/2019. (DMW)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time. The United States shall have until October 1, 2019, to file a civil in rem complaint for forfeiture of the Subject Currency and/or obtain an indictment or information charging one or more defendants with criminal activity related to the Subject Currency and giving notice in the indictment or information of the United States' intent to forfeit property as part of any sentence imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/26/2019. (DMW)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney John E. Childress, filed by Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding Judge Assignment in Miscellaneous Case. Judge James Patrick Hanlon and Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore assigned. Please include the complete case number, 2:19-mc-00005-JPH-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (DMW)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to October 1, 2019 TO FILE COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE AND/OR TO OBTAIN INDICTMENT ALLEGING FORFEITURE, filed by Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Childress, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Childress on behalf of Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Childress, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $43,860.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: $43,860.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Represented By: John E. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?