BRYMER v. PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Brymer and PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC DBA PILOT FLYING J
Defendant: ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. and PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00106
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Due, Danford)
April 16, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC.(Due, Danford)
April 16, 2020 Filing 21 Jurisdictional Statement by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Due, Danford)
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 MARGINAL ENTRY, Motions terminated: #19 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Arby's ONLY, as to Defendant PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC, filed by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC, ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. filed by ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. terminated. The Court acknowledges the Stipulation of Dismissal of Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. d/b/a Arby's Restaurant Only. Dkt. #19 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss only Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. d/b/a Arby's Restaurant from the docket. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/15/2020.(KAA)
April 14, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Arby's ONLY, as to Defendant PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC, filed by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC, ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Due, Danford)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC . (Due, Danford)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Thomas Williams on behalf of Plaintiff ROBERT BRYMER. (Williams, Zachary)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - Pilot SHALL FILE a jurisdictional statement by April 20, 2020, addressing the issues identified in this order and analyzing jurisdiction as of the time of removal. See Hukic, 588 F.3d at 427. Plaintiff SHALL RESPOND to Pilot's jurisdictional allegations by May 4, 2020. See S.D. Ind. L.R. 81-1(b). See Order. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/17/2020.(KAA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Due, Danford)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC.(Due, Danford)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. See Order for further instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/6/2020.(KAA)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Christopher John Appel hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Appel, Christopher)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Appel on behalf of Defendant ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.. (Appel, Christopher)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.. (Due, Danford)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Danford Royce Due on behalf of Defendant ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.. (Due, Danford)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Due, Danford)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Operative Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, Appearance for Brymer, Summons, Complaint, Service of Process, Proof of Service of Process, Appearance for Pilot, Order Granting Extension of Time, Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Due, Danford)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Appel on behalf of Defendant PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Appel, Christopher)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - CORRECTED FILING AT #6 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Danford Royce Due on behalf of Defendant PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Due, Danford) Modified on 2/26/2020 (RSF).
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Danford Royce Due on behalf of Defendant PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Due, Danford)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vermillion Circuit, case number 83C01-2001-CT-000002, filed by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC DBA PILOT FLYING J. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5873043) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 State Court Record)(Due, Danford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYMER v. PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brymer
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Williams
Represented By: Alexander H. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC DBA PILOT FLYING J
Represented By: Danford Royce Due
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARBY'S RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Danford Royce Due
Represented By: Christopher J. Appel
Represented By: Christopher John Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Danford Royce Due
Represented By: Christopher J. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?