BRYANT v. WARDEN, USP TERRE HAUTE
Petitioner: KHALID BRYANT
Respondent: WARDEN USP TERRE HAUTE
Case Number: 2:2020cv00300
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #5 Order to Show Cause, filed by WARDEN USP TERRE HAUTE.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jan Stopps, #2 Attachments to Declaration of Jan Stopps)(Preston, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Petitioner KHALID BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Preston on behalf of Respondent WARDEN USP TERRE HAUTE. (Preston, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The respondent shall have until July 31, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days after service of the answer in which to reply. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or demonstrate his financial inability to do so (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/22/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JDH)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00452. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 11, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Indiana.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (eh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/11/20. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana for all further proceedings. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Khalid Bryant. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT v. WARDEN, USP TERRE HAUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN USP TERRE HAUTE
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KHALID BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?