LETNER v. VIGO COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: CHARLES LESLIE LETNER, JR.
Defendant: VIGO COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 2:2020cv00421
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/5/2020.(KAA)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Dismissing Case and Directing Entry of Final Judgment - On August 19, 2020, the Court ordered the plaintiff to submit more information in support of his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and to file an amended complaint by September 21, 2020. Dkt. #5 . That deadline has passed. It appears that he has abandoned this case. Accordingly, judgment dismissing this action without prejudice shall now issue. The plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied as moot. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/5/2020. (KAA)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Entry Addressing Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Screening and Dismissing Complaint, and Directing Further Proceedings - Mr. Letner shall have through September 21, 2020, to submit a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. To facilitate this, the clerk is directed to send a copy of this Entry to the Vigo County Sheriff. Mr. Letner shall also have through September 21, 2020, to file an amended complaint. Failure to take action by this date may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. SEE ORDER. Distributed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/19/2020.(KAA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES LESLIE LETNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VIGO COUNTY JAIL, filed by CHARLES LESLIE LETNER, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LETNER v. VIGO COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIGO COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES LESLIE LETNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?