HACKNEY v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Petitioner: JOSHUA HACKNEY
Respondent: I.D.O.C. and STATE OF INDIANA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00424
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. He shall have through October 30, 2020, to renew his motion by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action on August 19, 2020. Otherwise, he must pay the $5.00 filing fee. Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/2/2020. (KAA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #3 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary), filed by I.D.O.C., STATE OF INDIANA.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conduct Report, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Evidence Record, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Notice of Confiscated Property, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Report of Field Examination, #5 Exhibit B - Screening Report, #6 Exhibit B-1 - Lay Advocate Form, #7 Exhibit C - Hearing Report, #8 Exhibit D - Facility Appeal, #9 Exhibit E - DOC Appeal, #10 Exhibit F - List of Offenses, June 4, 2018, #11 Exhibit G - Policy and Procedure, #12 Exhibit H - Hackney OIS)(Talbot, Monika)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Originally Docketed in 2:20-cv-435-JPH-MJD), filed by Petitioner JOSHUA HACKNEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Monika P. Talbot on behalf of Respondents I.D.O.C., STATE OF INDIANA. (Talbot, Monika)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - Joshua Hackney's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in disciplinary case number ISF 20-03-0336 on March 23, 2020. The petitioner shall have through September 21, 2020, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2020. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/20/2020.(JRB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOSHUA HACKNEY. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HACKNEY v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: I.D.O.C.
Represented By: Monika P. Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Monika P. Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSHUA HACKNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?