MCCLAIN v. DICKERSON et al
Plaintiff: JOE HOWARD MCCLAIN
Defendant: JUDY PYNE, DENNIS ALEXANDER, MELODEE SUE DICKERSON and EDWARD BECK
Case Number: 2:2020cv00430
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF DOCUMENTS - On August 28, 2020, the Court ordered the clerk to close this case and return all documents to Mr. McClain. Dkt. #3 . Since then, Mr. McClain has filed two additional documents. See dkt. #4 ; dkt. #5 . Because the previous order remains in place, the clerk is directed to return copies of the recently submitted documents to the petitioner as unfiled and void any file stamp from this Court on the documents. Copies to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 4 and 5)(KAA)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JOE HOWARD MCCLAIN. (AAS)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOE HOWARD MCCLAIN. (AAS)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF DOCUMENTS AND CLOSING CASE - The clerk is directed send a copy all documents in this action to the petitioner as unfiled and void any file stamp from this Court on the documents. The clerk is directed to close this action on the docket. No final judgment shall issue because no claims were adjudicated in this action. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/28/2020.(KAA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS ALEXANDER, EDWARD BECK, MELODEE SUE DICKERSON, JUDY PYNE, filed by JOE HOWARD MCCLAIN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Brief, #2 Exhibit 5 Allen Superior Court CRM 10197, #3 Exhibit K FBI record)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLAIN v. DICKERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HOWARD MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY PYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELODEE SUE DICKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD BECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?