WYRICK v. GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK
Defendant: GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00516
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of this date, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/29/2020.(KAA)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 3:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/22/2020.(LBT)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Wilson on behalf of Defendant GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.. (Wilson, Heather)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK. (Kondras, Robert)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK. (Kondras, Robert)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.. (Will, Alexander)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.. (Will, Alexander)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Phillip Will on behalf of Defendant GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.. (Will, Alexander)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK. GOLIATH FREIGHT INC. served on 10/7/2020. (Kondras, Robert) Modified on 10/13/2020 (KAA).
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.. (KAA)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK. (Kondras, Robert)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOLIATH FREIGHT INC., filed by CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6209400) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYRICK v. GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. WYRICK
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLIATH FREIGHT INC.
Represented By: Heather L. Wilson
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?