ZEIGLER et al v. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ROSE ANNA L. ZEIGLER and DUSTIN W. ZEIGLER
Defendant: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00590
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Brounson, Janeia)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (RSF)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 2:20-cv-00590-JRS-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (RSF)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/12/2020. (PKP)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Indianapolis Division on 11/05/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-2813-TWP-TAB. Case assigned to Judge James Patrick Hanlon and Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore., filed by DUSTIN W. ZEIGLER, ROSE ANNA L. ZEIGLER.(NAD)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Brounson, Janeia)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Terre Haute Division, filed by Defendant FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case)(Brounson, Janeia)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pending State Court Motions, filed by Defendant FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Voigtmann, Mark)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent First American Title Insurance Company for FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Voigtmann, Mark)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Voigtmann, Mark)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vigo Superior Court, case number 84D06-2008-PL-004348, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6251544) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Summons, Appearance, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Voigtmann, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZEIGLER et al v. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Voigtmann
Represented By: Janeia LaShell Brounson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE ANNA L. ZEIGLER
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN W. ZEIGLER
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?