HALL v. WATSON
Petitioner: ORLANDO CORDIA HALL
Respondent: T.J. WATSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv00599
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER of USCA as to #19 Notice of Appeal filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL (USCA #20-3229) - The district court's judgment is AFFIRMED. The motion to stay execution, which Hall renewed in this court, is DENIED. (See Order.) (RSF)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION PENDING APPEAL - For the reasons set forth in the Court's order denying motion for stay of execution, dkt. #18 , Mr. Hall's motion to stay execution pending appeal and for stay pending disposition of stay motion by the Seventh Circuit, dkt. #23 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/18/2020. (RSF) **Emailed to USCA re #20-3229** Modified on 11/19/2020 (LBT).
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 USCA Case Number 20-3229 for #19 Notice of Appeal filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (RSF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Execution Pending Appeal and For Stay Pending Disposition of Stay Motion by the Seventh Circuit, filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 **** DEATH PENALTY MATTER *** Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #19 Notice of Appeal. - for Court of Appeals Use Only. (RSF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re #19 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys/Parties attached. (RSF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 20 DOCKETING STATEMENT by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL re #19 Notice of Appeal (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #18 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Filing fee $505, receipt number 0756-6280380) (Attachments: #1 November 17, 2020 Order Denying Motion for Stay of Execution)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION - Less than a week ago, this Court denied Mr. Hall's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, and Mr. Hall filed a second 2241 petition. Before the Court is Mr. Hall's motion for a stay of execution pending resolution of his second 2241 petition. Mr. Hall's motion for stay of execution, dkt. #3 , is DENIED. The motion for oral argument, dkt. #4 , is DENIED as moot. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/17/2020. (RSF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W. McKay on behalf of Respondent T.J. WATSON. (McKay, Brian)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corrected Filing, filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL, re #15 Reply in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner Orlando Hall's Corrected Reply Memorandum in Support of Petition and Motion for a Stay of Execution) (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION to Stay Execution , filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robert C. Owen, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Marcy Widder)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Glen Bradshaw on behalf of Respondent T.J. WATSON. (Bradshaw, Jonathan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #3 MOTION to Stay Execution , filed by Respondent T.J. WATSON. (Bradshaw, Jonathan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Stay Execution , filed by Respondent T.J. WATSON. (Bradshaw, Jonathan)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Pieter Van Tol for ORLANDO CORDIA HALL added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Mr. Van Tol via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/13/2020. (KAA)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kathryn M. Ali for ORLANDO CORDIA HALL added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Ms. Ali via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/13/2020. (KAA)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This matter has come before the Court on motion of Kaitlyn A. Golden seeking an order granting leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of the Plaintiff, Orlando Cordia Hall, in the above-styled cause only, Dkt. #2 . Being fully advised, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/13/2020. (KAA)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Pieter Van Tol to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6274838), filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Pieter Van Tol in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kathryn M. Ali to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6274824), filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Kathryn M. Ali in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION - Orlando Cordia Hall, a federal inmate, is scheduled for execution on November 19, 2020. On November 12, 2020, he filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus and a motion for stay of execution. The respondent shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Monday, November 16, 2020, to file a response, and Mr. Hall shall have until noon Tuesday, November 17, 2020, to file a reply. Email to counsel per distribution list. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/13/2020.(RSF)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 2:20-cv-00599-JPH-DLP, on all future filings in this matter. (RSF)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Petitioner Orlando Hall's Motion for Oral Argument, filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Execution, filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner Orlando Hall's Memorandum of Law in Support of his Motion for a Stay of Execution)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kaitlyn A. Golden to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6273354), filed by Petitioner ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0756-6273346) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - Indictment, #4 Exhibit 2 - Verdict, Guilt, #5 Exhibit 3 - Verdict, Penalty, #6 Exhibit 4 - Sparling Manual Excerpt, #7 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Scott Phillips, #8 Exhibit 6 - Census Statistic for Additional Observations on the Merits, #9 Exhibit 7 - Prospective Juror Questionnaire Cover Pages, #10 Exhibit 8 - Trial Tr. Vol. 13, #11 Exhibit 9 - Trial Tr. Vol. 12 (Batson Hearing Transcript), #12 Exhibit 10 - Trial Tr. Vol. 9, #13 Exhibit 11 - Trial Tr. Vol. 10, #14 Exhibit 12 - Juror Questionnaire of Evans, #15 Exhibit 13 - Government's Strike List for Preemptory Challenges, #16 Exhibit 14 - Trial Tr. Vol. 2, #17 Exhibit 15 - Trial Tr. Vol. 3, #18 Exhibit 16 - Trial Tr. Vol. 4, #19 Exhibit 17 - Trial Tr. Vol. 5, #20 Exhibit 18 - Trial Tr. Vol. 7, #21 Exhibit 19 - Trial Tr. Vol. 11, #22 Exhibit 20 - Trial Tr. Vol. 6, #23 Exhibit 21 - Juror Questionnaire of Herring, #24 Exhibit 22 - Juror Questionnaire of Harrell, #25 Exhibit 23 - Trial Tr. Vol. 8, #26 Exhibit 24 - Juror Questionnaire of Donaldson, #27 Exhibit 25 - Juror Questionnaire of Davis, #28 Exhibit 26 - Juror Questionnaire of Cox, #29 Exhibit 27 - Juror Questionnaire of Lee, #30 Exhibit 28 - Juror Questionnaire of Boggess, #31 Exhibit 29 - Juror Questionnaire of Perry, #32 Exhibit 30 - Juror Questionnaire of Crittendon, #33 Exhibit 31 - Trial Tr. Vol. 1, #34 Exhibit 32 - Declaration of Kevin McNally, #35 Exhibit 33 - Hall's Motion to Dismiss, in Case No. 4:94-121-Y, #36 Exhibit 34 - Gov't's Resp. to Hall's Motion to Dismiss, in Case No. 4:94-121-Y, #37 Exhibit 35 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, in Case No. 4:94-121-Y)(Golden, Kaitlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ORLANDO CORDIA HALL
Represented By: Kaitlyn A. Golden
Represented By: Pieter Van Tol
Represented By: Kathryn M. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T.J. WATSON
Represented By: Jonathan Glen Bradshaw
Represented By: Brian W. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?